Global Patent Index - EP 1032881 A1

EP 1032881 A1 2000-09-06 - A ROBUST, RELIABLE COMPRESSION AND PACKETIZATION SCHEME FOR TRANSMITTING VIDEO

Title (en)

A ROBUST, RELIABLE COMPRESSION AND PACKETIZATION SCHEME FOR TRANSMITTING VIDEO

Title (de)

ROBUSTES ZUVERLÄSSIGES KOMPRESSIONS- UND PACKETIERUNGSVERFAHREN ZUR ÜBERTRAGUNG VON VIDEO

Title (fr)

SCHEMA DE CODAGE DE COMPRESSION ET DE MISE EN PAQUETS ROBUSTE, FIABLE, UTILE POUR LA TRANSMISSION DE VIDEOS

Publication

EP 1032881 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98939098 A

Priority

  • US 9815564 W
  • US 5387197 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9905602A1] For transmitting digital video information over a network such as the Internet, a hybrid coding scheme (Figs. 9-18) with wavelet I frame coding and H.263 predictive coding produces a robust, low bit rate video coding scheme. A new packetization method analyzes macroblock level dependency structure (Fig. 19) and packetizes the bit stream so as to minimize dependencies between packets and thereby minimize packet loss damage.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G06F 13/00; H04N 7/26; H04N 7/64

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G06T 9/00 (2006.01); H04N 19/89 (2014.01); H04N 21/236 (2011.01); H04N 21/434 (2011.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H04N 21/434 (2013.01); H04N 19/517 (2014.11); H04N 19/60 (2014.11); H04N 19/61 (2014.11); H04N 19/63 (2014.11); H04N 19/647 (2014.11); H04N 19/70 (2013.01); H04N 21/236 (2013.01); H04N 19/30 (2013.01); H04N 19/65 (2014.11); H04N 19/89 (2014.11)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

WO 9905602 A1 19990204; AU 8759198 A 19990216; EP 1032881 A1 20000906; EP 1032881 A4 20050831

INPADOC legal status


2010-09-22 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20100402

2008-02-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20080129

2005-08-31 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: A4

- Effective date: 20050711

2005-05-18 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7G 06F 13/00 A

2005-05-18 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7H 04N 7/64 B

2005-05-18 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7H 04N 7/26 B

2000-09-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000303

2000-09-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB