Global Patent Index - EP 1032900 A1

EP 1032900 A1 2000-09-06 - AUTOMATED BANKING MACHINE WITH SELF AUDITING CAPABILITIES AND SYSTEM

Title (en)

AUTOMATED BANKING MACHINE WITH SELF AUDITING CAPABILITIES AND SYSTEM

Title (de)

AUTOMATISIERTE ABRECHNUNGS-MASCHINE MIT FÄHIGKEITEN UND SYSTEM ZUR SELBSTKONTROLLE

Title (fr)

GUICHET AUTOMATIQUE BANCAIRE AVEC CAPACITE ET SYSTEME D'AUTO-SURVEILLANCE

Publication

EP 1032900 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98958100 A

Priority

  • US 9824821 W
  • US 6729897 P
  • US 9431498 P
  • US 19301698 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9928846A1] An automated banking machine (10) identifies and stores in storage areas documents such as currency bills deposited by a user. The machine selectively recovers such documents from storage areas and dispenses them. The machine includes a central transport (70) wherein documents deposited in a stack are unstacked, oriented and identified. Such documents are then routed to storage areas in canisters (92, 94, 96, 98). Documents in the storage areas are selectively picked therefrom and delivered to a user through an input/output area (50) of the machine. Each canister includes a memory (626) which holds information concerning the number and type of documents housed in the canister as well as other information concerning the hardware and software resident on the canister. The memory also includes data representative of individuals responsible for loading and transporting the canister. The machine conducts self-auditing activities to verify that the documents held in the storage areas correspond to the information stored in memory and indicate discrepancies.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G06F 17/60

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G06Q 20/00 (2012.01); G07D 11/00 (2006.01); G07F 19/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G07F 19/20 (2013.01); G06Q 20/00 (2013.01); G07D 11/0054 (2013.01); G07D 11/0063 (2013.01); G07D 11/0072 (2013.01); G07D 11/0075 (2013.01); G07F 19/202 (2013.01); G07F 19/205 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

WO 9928846 A1 19990610; BR 9815283 A 20001024; BR 9815283 B1 20110823; CA 2305319 A1 19990610; CA 2305319 C 20030708; CN 1279794 A 20010110; CN 1279794 B 20100602; EP 1032900 A1 20000906; EP 1032900 A4 20010502

INPADOC legal status


2016-11-23 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20160601

2008-07-30 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: FORCE, MATTHEW

2008-07-30 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: GRAEF, H., THOMAS

2008-07-30 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: BOWSER, ROBERT

2008-07-30 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: EASTMAN, JEFFREY

2008-07-30 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: HARTY, MICHAEL

2008-07-30 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: JUNKINS, ANDREW

2008-07-30 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: OWENS, MARK

2008-07-30 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: RYAN, MIKE

2008-07-30 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: LINDROOS, MICHAEL, E.

2007-10-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20070827

2001-05-02 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20010320

2001-05-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2001-05-02 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7G 06F 17/60 A, 7G 07F 7/10 B, 7G 07D 11/00 B

2000-09-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000526

2000-09-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT