Global Patent Index - EP 1032928 A1

EP 1032928 A1 2000-09-06 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR SIGNALLING LOCAL TRAFFIC DELAYS

Title (en)

METHOD AND DEVICE FOR SIGNALLING LOCAL TRAFFIC DELAYS

Title (de)

VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM SIGNALISIEREN VON LOKALEN VERKEHRSSTÖRUNGEN

Title (fr)

PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF POUR INDIQUER PAR DES SIGNAUX DES INTERRUPTIONS LOCALES DE LA CIRCULATION

Publication

EP 1032928 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98963454 A

Priority

  • DE 19750942 A
  • EP 9807283 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19750942A1] Road vehicles are equipped with transmitter/receivers and when a number of them are traveling in a column one of them acts as a reference vehicle. Each vehicle has identification data and means of transmitting data such as speed and distance. This enables warnings of hard braking or sudden changes in speed to be relayed to vehicles not within sight of each other.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G08G 1/09

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B60W 30/00 (2006.01); G08G 1/09 (2006.01); G08G 1/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G08G 1/163 (2013.01); G08G 1/096716 (2013.01); G08G 1/096725 (2013.01); G08G 1/096758 (2013.01); G08G 1/096775 (2013.01); G08G 1/096791 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9926212A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19750942 A1 19990520; EP 1032928 A1 20000906; EP 1032928 B1 20020320; JP 2001523871 A 20011127; JP 4132662 B2 20080813; US 2002082768 A1 20020627; US 6397141 B1 20020528; WO 9926212 A1 19990527

INPADOC legal status


2016-01-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151123

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-01-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151126

- Year of fee payment: 18

2003-03-12 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20021223

2002-12-27 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EN

2002-09-25 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020925

2002-04-25 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59803467

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2002-04-25

2002-04-10 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20020320

2002-03-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2002-03-20 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020320

2002-03-20 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020320

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-05-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: DEFINIENS AG.

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2000-11-15 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20001002

2000-09-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000615

2000-09-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT