Global Patent Index - EP 1032933 A1

EP 1032933 A1 2000-09-06 - SPEECH CODING METHOD AND TERMINALS FOR IMPLEMENTING SAID METHOD

Title (en)

SPEECH CODING METHOD AND TERMINALS FOR IMPLEMENTING SAID METHOD

Title (de)

SPRACH-KODIERUNGS-VERFAHREN UND ENDGERÄTE ZUM IMPLEMENTIEREN BESAGTEN VERFAHRENS

Title (fr)

PROCEDE DE CODAGE DE LA PAROLE ET TERMINAUX POUR LA MISE EN OEUVRE DU PROCEDE

Publication

EP 1032933 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 98955709 A

Priority

  • FR 9802486 W
  • FR 9714667 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: FR2771544A1] The use of a secondary code word for each phonic unit ensures that the received speech signal does not lack personal quality. The procedure for encoding speech includes analysis of the speech as a series of phonic units. These phonic units are compared with reference units which are stored in a library of units, and associated with primary code words. The system then includes determination of the difference between the analysed units and the library units, and encoding the differences by use of secondary code words. The phonic unit may then be represented by a pair of primary and secondary code words. After a further analysis of the spectral energy of the unit, weighting coefficients may also be determined, and these may be integrated into the secondary code word.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G10L 3/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G10L 19/00 (2013.01); G10L 25/18 (2013.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G10L 19/0018 (2013.01); G10L 25/18 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9927521A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

FR 2771544 A1 19990528; FR 2771544 B1 20001229; DE 69820903 D1 20040205; DE 69820903 T2 20041209; EP 1032933 A1 20000906; EP 1032933 B1 20040102; WO 9927521 A1 19990603

INPADOC legal status


2017-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20161024

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-01-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20161027

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20161020

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-10-24 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-08-26 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

- Owner name: SAGEMCOM BROADBAND SAS, FR

- Effective date: 20160727

2016-08-26 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Owner name: SAGEMCOM BROADBAND SAS, FR

- Effective date: 20160727

2015-10-23 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 18

2013-03-21 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: SAGEMCOM SAS, FR

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: SAGEM TELECOMMUNICATIONS S. A., PARIS, FR

- Document: DE 69820903

- Effective date: 20130129

2012-03-15 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: SAGEMCOM SAS, FR

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: SAGEM S.A., PARIS, FR

- Document: DE 69820903

- Effective date: 20120120

2012-01-20 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 69820903

- Representative's name: ,

2012-01-20 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 69820903

2012-01-20 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Owner name: SAGEMCOM BROADBAND SAS, FR

- Effective date: 20111215

2010-08-27 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2009-04-22 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Free text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20090326 AND 20090401

2009-04-15 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Free text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20090319 AND 20090325

2006-05-26 [REG FR CA] CHANGE OF ADDRESS

2006-05-26 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

2006-05-26 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2004-12-22 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20041005

2004-05-12 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20040416

2004-02-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69820903 P 20040205

2004-01-07 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-01-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2003-06-25 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7G 10L 19/00 A

2000-11-08 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000921

2000-09-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000620

2000-09-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB