Global Patent Index - EP 1032940 A1

EP 1032940 A1 2000-09-06 - METHOD FOR PRODUCING A MAGNETIC ALLOY POWDER

Title (en)

METHOD FOR PRODUCING A MAGNETIC ALLOY POWDER

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES MAGNETLEGIERUNGSPULVERS

Title (fr)

PROCEDE POUR PRODUIRE UNE POUDRE D'ALLIAGE MAGNETIQUE

Publication

EP 1032940 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98956933 A

Priority

  • DE 19751366 A
  • DE 19751367 A
  • EP 9807418 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: US6352597B1] A method is disclosed enabling a technologically controllable and economical production of a hard-magnetic powder composed of a samarium-cobalt base alloy for highly coercive permanent magnets. The method is based on a HDDR treatment in which a starting powder is subjected to hydrogenation with disproportionation of the alloy in a first method step under hydrogen and, in a subsequent, second method step under vacuum conditions, a hydrogen desorption with recombination of the alloy. A starting powder containing samarium and cobalt is treated in the first method step either at a high temperature in the range of 500° C. to 900° C. and with a high hydrogen pressure of >0.5 MPa or by applying an intensive fine grinding at a low temperature in the range of 50° C. to 500° C. and with a hydrogen pressure of >0.15 MPa. By means of the method of the invention, magnetic alloy powders can be produced from samarium-cobalt base alloys; highly coercive permanent magnets can be produced from these magnetic alloy powders, particularly by hot compacting or plastic bonding.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01F 1/055

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B22F 9/00 (2006.01); B22F 9/02 (2006.01); B22F 9/04 (2006.01); C22C 33/02 (2006.01); H01F 1/055 (2006.01); H01F 1/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01F 1/0553 (2013.01); B22F 9/023 (2013.01); B22F 9/04 (2013.01); B22F 2999/00 (2013.01)

Combination set (CPC)

  1. B22F 2999/00 + B22F 2201/013 + B22F 9/023
  2. B22F 2999/00 + B22F 1/0085 + B22F 9/04

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9927544A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE DK FI FR GB LI SE

EPO simple patent family

US 6352597 B1 20020305; EP 1032940 A1 20000906; EP 1032940 B1 20010912; JP 2001524604 A 20011204; WO 9927544 A1 19990603

INPADOC legal status


2014-08-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140603

2014-08-28 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59801474

- Effective date: 20140603

2013-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20121123

- Year of fee payment: 15

2006-11-03 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20060731

2006-07-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060731

2006-07-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20051119

2006-07-14 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2005-11-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051130

2005-11-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051130

2005-11-19 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051119

2004-11-23 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20041123

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-11-18 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20041118

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-11-10 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20041110

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-09-04 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-01-11 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-01-09 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20011214

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-12 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20011212

2001-10-18 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59801474 20011018

2001-09-14 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2001-09-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE DK FI FR GB LI SE

2001-09-12 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010912

2001-09-12 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010912

2000-12-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20001114

2000-09-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000602

2000-09-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE DK FI FR GB LI SE