Global Patent Index - EP 1032941 A1

EP 1032941 A1 2000-09-06 - MINIATURISED FLAT SPOOL RELAY

Title (en)

MINIATURISED FLAT SPOOL RELAY

Title (de)

MINIATURISIERTES FLACHSPUL-RELAIS

Title (fr)

RELAIS MINIATURISE A BOBINE PLATE

Publication

EP 1032941 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98951151 A

Priority

  • CH 9800475 W
  • CH 267697 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9927548A1] The invention relates to a microrelay comprising a magnetic spool, a contact support body (2) within which contacts are arranged, a permanent magnet (32) and an armature (31) which is tiltable around its axis between two positions, as well as a spring-loaded reversing system. The inventive micro relay is characterised in that the magnetic spool system (1) is configured as a flat spool system (1) in the form of a microstructure arranged on a flow plate (11) and is composed of at least one flat microspool (12'). The pivoting armature (31') can itself be configured in the form of a three pole magnet (32') or a two pole magnet (32"). The inventive microrelay has a minimal overall height and can be produced in a cost effective way in an automated manufacturing process.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01H 1/00; H01H 51/22

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01H 50/00 (2006.01); H01H 51/22 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01H 50/005 (2013.01); H01H 2050/007 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9927548A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB IT LI SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9927548 A1 19990603; AU 9733298 A 19990615; CH 692829 A5 20021115; DE 59804089 D1 20020613; EP 1032941 A1 20000906; EP 1032941 B1 20020508; US 6492887 B1 20021210

INPADOC legal status


2008-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20051102

- Year of fee payment: 8

2008-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061130

2007-11-24 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061106

2007-08-03 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20070731

2007-07-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20061106

2007-07-13 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2007-06-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070601

2007-04-13 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: AXICOM LTD

- Free text: AXICOM LTD#SEESTRASSE 295, POSTFACH 220#8804 AU-WAEDENSWIL (CH) -TRANSFER TO- AXICOM LTD#SEESTRASSE 295, POSTFACH 220#8804 AU-WAEDENSWIL (CH)

2006-11-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061130

2006-11-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061130

2006-01-02 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20060102

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-11-25 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20051125

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-11-17 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20051117

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-11-02 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20051102

- Year of fee payment: 8

2003-05-02 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030211

2002-08-21 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20020731

2002-08-08 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020808

2002-06-13 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59804089 20020613

2002-05-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: PATENTANWAELTE BREITER + WIEDMER AG

2002-05-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-05-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI SE

2002-05-08 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020508

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-04-18 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010306

2000-09-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000527

2000-09-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI SE