Global Patent Index - EP 1032942 A1

EP 1032942 A1 2000-09-06 - SWITCHING DEVICE WITH AN ELECTRIC ARC EXTINGUISHING DEVICE

Title (en)

SWITCHING DEVICE WITH AN ELECTRIC ARC EXTINGUISHING DEVICE

Title (de)

SCHALTGERÄT MIT LICHTBOGEN-LÖSCHEINRICHTUNG

Title (fr)

APPAREIL DE DISTRIBUTION MUNI D'UN DISPOSITIF D'EXTINCTION D'ARC

Publication

EP 1032942 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98962230 A

Priority

  • DE 9803272 W
  • DE 29720715 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9927553A1] The invention relates to a switching device with an optimized explosion chamber (10). A lower baffle plate (12) extends in an area located behind the explosion chamber (10) and an upper baffle plate (11) is partitioned off in relation to said area due to the corresponding formation of an insulating strip (14) pertaining to the explosion chamber (10). The insulation strip (14) is provided with protruding tabs (18, 19).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01H 9/36

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01H 9/36 (2006.01); H01H 9/46 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01H 9/36 (2013.01); H01H 9/46 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9927553A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 29720715 U1 19980122; CN 1132207 C 20031224; CN 1278359 A 20001227; EP 1032942 A1 20000906; EP 1032942 B1 20020220; US 6262384 B1 20010717; WO 9927553 A1 19990603

INPADOC legal status


2018-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20180119

- Year of fee payment: 20

2018-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20171120

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-11-20 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-11-23 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-11-10 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2005-11-09 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051109

2003-02-12 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20021121

2002-08-09 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-03-28 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59803150 20020328

2002-02-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT

2001-07-11 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010523

2000-09-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000417

2000-09-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT