Global Patent Index - EP 1033007 A1

EP 1033007 A1 2000-09-06 - SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR AUTHENTICATING SIGNATURES

Title (en)

SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR AUTHENTICATING SIGNATURES

Title (de)

VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUM AUTHENTIFIZIEREN VON UNTERSCHRIFTEN

Title (fr)

SYSTEME ET PROCEDE PERMETTANT D'IDENTIFIER DES SIGNATURES

Publication

EP 1033007 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98933872 A

Priority

  • IL 9800342 W
  • IL 12138997 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9905816A1] A system and method for authenticating a signature, the system including a digitizer (10) and associated electronic pen (12), a dynamic identification unit (14) for receiving data from the digitizer (10) produced during the signature by the electronic pen (12) on the digitizer (10), calculating signature parameters and permitted variations from the data, and generating a reference record (15) therefrom, a comparator (17) for comparing the received parameters produced during signature with the reference record (15), and apparatus for providing an accept or reject response in accordance with the output of the comparator (17).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H04L 9/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G06K 9/00 (2006.01); G06Q 20/00 (2006.01); G06T 7/00 (2006.01); H04L 9/32 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G06K 9/00154 (2013.01); H04L 9/3231 (2013.01); H04L 2209/56 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9905816 A1 19990204; EP 1033007 A1 20000906; EP 1033007 A4 20020612; IL 121389 D0 19980104; JP 2003510668 A 20030318

INPADOC legal status


2006-03-29 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20050913

2003-07-09 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20030520

2002-07-24 [RA4] DATE AND KIND OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RA4

- Effective date: 20020607

2002-07-17 [RA4] DATE AND KIND OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RA4

- Effective date: 20020604

2002-06-26 [RA4] DATE AND KIND OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RA4

- Effective date: 20020515

2002-06-12 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: A4

- Effective date: 20020503

2002-06-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-06-05 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7H 04L 9/32 A, 7G 06K 9/00 B

2000-10-04 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: WONDERNET LTD.

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2000-09-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000215

2000-09-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE