Global Patent Index - EP 1033034 A1

EP 1033034 A1 2000-09-06 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR EVALUATING A DIGITAL DATA STREAM

Title (en)

METHOD AND DEVICE FOR EVALUATING A DIGITAL DATA STREAM

Title (de)

VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR AUSWERTUNG EINES DIGITALEN DATENSTROMES

Title (fr)

PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF D'ANALYSE D'UN FLUX DE DONNEES NUMERIQUES

Publication

EP 1033034 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99947284 A

Priority

  • DE 19841371 A
  • EP 9906586 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19841371A1] The method involves comparing identity bits, transferred at predefined bit positions in the packets, with reference identity bits. An indicator signal (I) is generated on detecting that all of the compared bits agree, to signal this agreement. The identity bits to be compared with each other are compared in a bit serial comparator. An Independent claim is also included for an evaluation device for a digital data flow.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H04N 5/00; H04L 7/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H04N 7/26 (2006.01); H04H 20/00 (2008.01); H04J 3/00 (2006.01); H04J 3/06 (2006.01); H04L 7/08 (2006.01); H04N 5/00 (2011.01); H04N 7/08 (2006.01); H04N 7/081 (2006.01); H04N 17/00 (2006.01); H04L 7/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H04N 21/434 (2013.01); H04L 7/041 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0016547A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19841371 A1 20000316; DE 19841371 B4 20060420; EP 1033034 A1 20000906; JP 2002525922 A 20020813; WO 0016547 A1 20000323

INPADOC legal status


2007-10-17 [18R] REFUSED

- Effective date: 20070614

2006-09-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20060804

2004-08-18 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: GRUNDIG MULTIMEDIA B.V.

2000-12-13 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: GRUNDIG AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT

2000-09-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000331

2000-09-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE