Global patent index - EP 1033054 A1

EP 1033054 A1 2000-09-06 - METHOD AND MOBILE COMMUNICATIONS SYSTEM FOR TRANSMITTING INFORMATION VIA A RADIO INTERFACE

Title (en)

METHOD AND MOBILE COMMUNICATIONS SYSTEM FOR TRANSMITTING INFORMATION VIA A RADIO INTERFACE

Title (de)

VERFAHREN UND MOBIL-KOMMUNIKATIONSSYSTEM ZUR ÜBERTRAGUNG VON INFORMATIONEN ÜBER EINE FUNKSCHNITTSTELLE

Title (fr)

PROCEDE ET SYSTEME DE COMMUNICATION MOBILE DESTINES A LA TRANSMISSION D'INFORMATIONS PAR UNE INTERFACE RADIO

Publication

EP 1033054 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98949932 A

Priority

  • DE 9802475 W
  • DE 19747453 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19747453C1] The aim of the invention is to provide a means of transmitting organisation information (oi) from one base station to several mobile stations simultaneously. To this end, a transmission channel (UKS) is provided in which the plurality of connections with the simultaneously received useful information (ni), said useful information being distinguishable according to a connection-specific fine structure is reduced in comparison to the maximum number of connections which can be transmitted. The organisation information (oi) are introduced into this transmission channel (UKS) and transmitted with a transmitting power which is higher than the corresponding transmitting powers for the connections with the useful information (ni).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H04Q 7/38

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H04J 7/00 (2006.01); H04W 52/00 (2009.01); H04J 13/00 (2011.01); H04W 48/12 (2009.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H04J 7/00 (2013.01); H04W 48/12 (2013.01); H04W 52/0216 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9922544A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR

EPO simple patent family

DE 19747453 C1 19990512; AU 9620598 A 19990517; CN 1169399 C 20040929; CN 1278396 A 20001227; EP 1033054 A1 20000906; WO 9922544 A1 19990506

INPADOC legal status

2012-01-04 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20110713

2007-12-12 [RAP3] CORRECTION OF THE ADDRESS OR NAME OF APPLICANT (A DOCUMENT)

- Owner name: NOKIA SIEMENS NETWORKS GMBH & CO. KG

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP3

2007-11-14 [RAP3] CORRECTION OF THE ADDRESS OR NAME OF APPLICANT (A DOCUMENT)

- Owner name: NOKIA SIEMENS NETWORKS S.P.A.

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP3

2007-10-17 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: NOKIA SIEMENS NETWORKS GMBH & CO. KG

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2001-12-05 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20011018

2000-09-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000417

2000-09-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR