Global patent index - EP 1033058 A1

EP 1033058 A1 2000-09-06 - METHOD AND SWITCHING PROCESS FOR CONTROLLING CONNECTIONS

Title (en)

METHOD AND SWITCHING PROCESS FOR CONTROLLING CONNECTIONS

Title (de)

VERFAHREN UND VERMITTLUNGSPROZESS ZUR STEUERUNG VON VERBINDUNGEN

Title (fr)

PROCEDE ET PROCESSUS DE COMMUTATION DESTINES A LA COMMANDE DE COMMUNICATIONS

Publication

EP 1033058 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98956913 A

Priority

  • EP 98956913 A
  • EP 9807278 W
  • EP 97120099 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0917386A1] The method involves controlling connections in a local exchange (LE), at which. The connections are initiated over the subscriber connection network are also controlled through the exchange, and a decision is made in the exchange, whether a connection is switched internal to the subscriber connection network or over the exchange. A connection is preferably switched internally to the subscriber connection network, if it is determined, that all arrangements required for the switching of the connection are available in the network.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H04Q 11/04; H04Q 3/62

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H04Q 3/62 (2006.01); H04Q 11/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H04Q 3/62 (2013.01); H04Q 11/0435 (2013.01); H04Q 2213/13031 (2013.01); H04Q 2213/13097 (2013.01); H04Q 2213/13106 (2013.01); H04Q 2213/13141 (2013.01); H04Q 2213/13176 (2013.01); H04Q 2213/13202 (2013.01); H04Q 2213/13209 (2013.01); H04Q 2213/13217 (2013.01); H04Q 2213/1322 (2013.01); H04Q 2213/13222 (2013.01); H04Q 2213/1324 (2013.01); H04Q 2213/13292 (2013.01); H04Q 2213/13299 (2013.01); H04Q 2213/13372 (2013.01); H04Q 2213/13389 (2013.01); H04Q 2213/13395 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9926447A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0917386 A1 19990519; CN 1127881 C 20031112; CN 1279872 A 20010110; EP 1033058 A1 20000906; WO 9926447 A1 19990527

INPADOC legal status

2009-06-03 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20081216

2007-12-12 [RAP3] CORRECTION OF THE ADDRESS OR NAME OF APPLICANT (A DOCUMENT)

- Owner name: NOKIA SIEMENS NETWORKS GMBH & CO. KG

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP3

2007-11-14 [RAP3] CORRECTION OF THE ADDRESS OR NAME OF APPLICANT (A DOCUMENT)

- Owner name: NOKIA SIEMENS NETWORKS S.P.A.

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP3

2007-10-17 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: NOKIA SIEMENS NETWORKS GMBH & CO. KG

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2006-08-23 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20050117

2005-03-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20050117

2000-09-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000417

2000-09-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT