Global Patent Index - EP 1033064 A1

EP 1033064 A1 2000-09-06 - WINDOW HEATER

Title (en)

WINDOW HEATER

Title (de)

SCHEIBENHEIZUNG

Title (fr)

SYSTEME DE CHAUFFAGE DE VITRE

Publication

EP 1033064 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98963320 A

Priority

  • DE 9803218 W
  • DE 19751423 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19751423A1] The invention relates to a window heater, especially for a motor vehicle, comprising a resistance heating device placed on the window or integrated therein. Said heating device can be connected to a voltage source via terminal contacts and electrical switching means. Said switching means (24) consists of a semi-conductor switching element (24) mounted directly on the window (12) to be heated.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H05B 1/00; G05D 22/02; G05D 23/19; G05D 23/20; H05B 1/02; H05B 3/26; H05B 3/34

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H05B 1/02 (2006.01); G05D 22/02 (2006.01); G05D 23/19 (2006.01); G05D 23/20 (2006.01); H05B 3/00 (2006.01); H05B 3/84 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H05B 3/84 (2013.01); H05B 1/0236 (2013.01); H05B 2203/016 (2013.01); H05B 2203/035 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9927756A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19751423 A1 19990602; EP 1033064 A1 20000906; EP 1033064 B1 20020213; JP 2001524742 A 20011204; JP 4199924 B2 20081224; US 6320159 B1 20011120; WO 9927756 A1 19990603

INPADOC legal status


2011-12-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101105

2011-09-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110531

2011-09-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081130

2011-08-11 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 59803098

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20110531

2010-06-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20100121

- Year of fee payment: 12

2010-04-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20091128

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-09-11 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20090731

2008-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20071120

- Year of fee payment: 10

2003-02-05 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20021114

2002-08-02 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2002-03-21 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59803098

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2002-03-21

2002-02-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT

2001-06-20 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010509

2000-09-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000620

2000-09-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT