Global Patent Index - EP 1033084 A2

EP 1033084 A2 2000-09-06 - Ladies' undergarment

Title (en)

Ladies' undergarment

Title (de)

Unterbekleidungsstück, insbesondere Damenunterbekleidungsstück

Title (fr)

Sous vêtement féminin

Publication

EP 1033084 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00103698 A

Priority

  • DE 29903484 U
  • DE 29909776 U
  • DE 29920469 U

Abstract (en)

An undergarment for women, especially a brassiere, panties, etc, comprises a textile layer reinforcement along its free edges. The reinforcements (16, 18, 20) are produced by adhering the textile material to the base material, using pressure and/or heat.

Abstract (de)

Ein Unterbekleidungsstück, insbesondere ein Büstenhalter, Slip oder dergleichen, ist entlang der freien Ränder (15, 17, 19) dadurch verstärkt, dass mindestens eine Lage textilen Materials (16, 18, 20) im Wege eines Schmelz- und/oder Klebevorgangs gegebenenfalls unter Anwendung von Druck und/oder Wärme im wesentlichen flächig mit dem Grundmaterial (13, 14) verbunden ist. Diese Verstärkungen (16, 18, 20) können durch Umschlagen von Randbereichen, durch Aufbringen eines Einfassbandes oder auch eines den Randbereich des Grundmaterials einschließenden Besatzbandes gebildet sein. Dadurch werden Nähvorgänge vermieden und die Herstellung eines mit Randverstärkungen versehenen Unterbekleidungsstücks wesentlich vereinfacht und zugleich der Tragekomfort verbessert. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A41C 3/00; A41B 9/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A41B 9/04 (2006.01); A41C 3/00 (2006.01); A41D 27/24 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A41C 3/0014 (2013.01); A41B 9/04 (2013.01); A41D 27/245 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1033084 A2 20000906; EP 1033084 A3 20001018; EP 1033084 B1 20030423; AT 237959 T 20030515; ES 2194638 T3 20031201

INPADOC legal status


2004-12-29 [27W] REVOKED

- Effective date: 20040708

2004-12-29 [GBPR] GB: PATENT REVOKED UNDER ART. 102 OF THE EP CONVENTION DESIGNATING THE UK AS CONTRACTING STATE

- Free text: 20040708

2004-10-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2004-04-07 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: DIM S.A. S.A. FEDIT-LORIOT & AUTRES CONSEILS E

- Effective date: 20040109

2004-04-07 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: VIVES VIDAL, VIVESA, S.A.

- Effective date: 20040123

2004-03-24 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: DIM S.A. S.A. FEDIT-LORIOT & AUTRES CONSEILS E

- Effective date: 20040109

2004-03-24 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: VIVES VIDAL, VIVESA, S.A.

- Effective date: 20040123

2004-03-17 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: DIM S.A. S.A. FEDIT-LORIOT & AUTRES CONSEILS E

- Effective date: 20040109

2004-03-17 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: VIVES VIDAL, VIVESA, S.A.

- Effective date: 20040123

2004-03-10 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: DIM S.A. S.A. FEDIT-LORIOT & AUTRES CONSEILS E

- Effective date: 20040109

2004-02-29 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040229

2004-02-29 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040229

2004-02-28 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040228

2004-02-27 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Payment date: 20040227

- Year of fee payment: 5

2004-02-23 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20040223

- Year of fee payment: 5

2004-02-17 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20040217

- Year of fee payment: 5

2004-02-02 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20040202

- Year of fee payment: 5

2004-01-09 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-11-26 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

- Document: IE 1033084E

2003-10-08 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

2003-10-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2003-09-09 [REG GR EP] EP PATENT VALIDATED IN GREECE

- Document: GR 20030402785

2003-07-23 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030723

2003-07-23 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030723

2003-07-23 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030723

2003-05-28 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2003-05-28 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50001831 P 20030528

2003-04-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2003-04-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-04-23 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-04-23 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030423

2003-04-23 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030423

2001-07-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-12-13 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20001030

2000-11-15 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000921

2000-10-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-10-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-10-18 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7A 41C 3/00 A, 7A 41B 9/04 B, 7A 41D 27/24 B

2000-09-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-09-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI