Global Patent Index - EP 1033088 A1

EP 1033088 A1 2000-09-06 - Shoe with anti-vibration solestructure

Title (en)

Shoe with anti-vibration solestructure

Title (de)

Schuh mit Antivibrationssohlenanordnung

Title (fr)

Chaussure avec semelage anti vibrations

Publication

EP 1033088 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 00104224 A

Priority

FR 9902806 A

Abstract (en)

The anti-vibration sole for footwear has a thin elastic membrane (8) with a shore hardness of between twenty and thirty degrees. The membrane is fitted between the upper layer (7) of the sole and the footwear upper (3) to screen vibrations when walking.

Abstract (fr)

L'invention se rapporte à une chaussure et concerne le traitement des micro-vibrations susceptibles d'apparaître entre le semelage (2) et la tige (3) de cette dernière par effet de résonance lors de l'impact avec le sol. Une membrane élastique (8) de faible épaisseur et de dureté Shore A de l'ordre de 20 à 30 degrés Shore A est interposée entre la couche nerf (7) du semelage (2) et la tige (3) pour faire office d'écran dynamique vis-à-vis des micro-vibrations. L'invention est particulièrement destinée à la conception des chaussures de sport, telles que de marche et/ou de course. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A43B 13/18; A43B 5/00; A43B 13/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A43B 13/04 (2006.01); A43B 5/00 (2006.01); A43B 7/14 (2006.01); A43B 13/12 (2006.01); A43B 13/14 (2006.01); A43B 13/18 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A43B 5/049 (2013.01); A43B 5/00 (2013.01); A43B 7/1495 (2013.01); A43B 13/12 (2013.01); A43B 13/18 (2013.01); A43B 23/26 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1033088 A1 20000906; CN 1267491 A 20000927; FR 2790371 A1 20000908; FR 2790371 B1 20010420; JP 2000253903 A 20000919; US 2002020078 A1 20020221

INPADOC legal status


2004-01-14 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030708

2003-04-09 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030225

2001-05-23 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-04-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010220

2000-09-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-09-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI