Global Patent Index - EP 1033090 A2

EP 1033090 A2 2000-09-06 - Ring with pivoting ornament

Title (en)

Ring with pivoting ornament

Title (de)

Fingerring mit drehbar gelagertem Schmuckteil

Title (fr)

Bague à ornement pivotant

Publication

EP 1033090 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00103436 A

Priority

DE 29903445 U

Abstract (en)

The ring has a ring rail (1) and a turnable decorative jewel part (10). A locking device (7,8,16) between the ring rail and jewel part locks the jewel in positions, where its upper or lower side (21,22) are visible. The two locking positions are at 180 degrees relative to each other, and the jewel part may be turned in either direction about an axis (6), which extends in the circumferential direction of the ring rail. The jewel part is held in a gap (9) between two parallel end faces (11,12) in the rail.

Abstract (de)

Beschrieben wird ein Fingerring mit einer Ringschiene (1) und mit einem Schmuckteil (10), welches eine Oberseite (21) und eine Unterseite (22) hat und derart in der Ringschiene (1) drehbar gelagert ist, daß die Oberseite (21) und die Unterseite (22) des Schmuckteils (10) vertauscht werden können. Erfindungsgemäß ist vorgesehen, daß eine Arretiereinrichtung (7, 8, 16), die zwischen der Ringschiene (1) und dem Schmuckteil (10) wirksam ist und zwei Arretierstellungen für das Schmuckteil (10) aufweist, welches durch Vertauschen von Oberseite (21) und Unterseite (22) von der einen in die andere Arretierstellung überführbar ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A44C 17/02; A44C 9/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A44C 9/00 (2006.01); A44C 17/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A44C 17/0258 (2013.01); A44C 9/00 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29903445 U1 19990909; EP 1033090 A2 20000906; EP 1033090 A3 20001018

INPADOC legal status


2002-05-23 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2002-04-17 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20010419

2001-07-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2000-10-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-10-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-09-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-09-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI