Global patent index - EP 1033091 A1

EP 1033091 A1 2000-09-06 - Shelving unit

Title (en)

Shelving unit

Title (de)

Lagergestell

Title (fr)

Rayonnage

Publication

EP 1033091 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99104332 A

Priority

EP 99104332 A

Abstract (en)

The shelf system consists of vertical posts (1) which are passed through holes in shelf end pieces (4). These are held in place by locking components in the holes which cooperate with grooves (5) on the posts. The shelves (3) fit into the end pieces

Abstract (de)

Lagergestell mit Tragpfosten 1, dazwischen angeordneten Fachböden 3 und Halteelementen 4, die diese mit den Tragpfosten verbinden, wobei die Tragpfosten 1 in Abständen mit zahlreichen Vertiefungen 5 zur Festlegung der Höhenlage der Fachböden 3 versehen sind und die Fachböden über Verbindungsbrücken 2 an den Tragpfosten 1 festgelegt sind. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47B 57/26; A47B 47/05; A47B 57/54

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47B 57/26 (2006.01); A47B 96/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47B 96/024 (2013.01); A47B 57/265 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1033091 A1 20000906

INPADOC legal status

2004-02-04 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18W

- Effective date: 20031208

2003-02-26 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20030110

2001-08-22 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Ref Legal Event Code: RBV

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB IT

2001-07-12 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2001-06-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010407

2001-05-23 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: BE FR GB IT

2000-09-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB IT

2000-09-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI