Global Patent Index - EP 1033093 A1

EP 1033093 A1 2000-09-06 - Bracket for attachment of baskets, basins or trays between vertical shoulders of frames for vertical drawers

Title (en)

Bracket for attachment of baskets, basins or trays between vertical shoulders of frames for vertical drawers

Title (de)

Beschlag zum Befestigen von Körben, Schalen oder Tablaren zwischen vertikalen Schenkeln von stehenden Rahmen bei Hochschrankauszügen

Title (fr)

Console pour la fixation de paniers, bassins ou plateaux entre les côtés de cadres pour des tiroirs en vertical

Publication

EP 1033093 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00104050 A

Priority

AT 35999 A

Abstract (en)

The clip for mounting baskets, drawers or shelves between the vertical supports of a frame in fitted cupboards has a main body (10) with sloping portions (16, 17, 19, 20) on both sides which taper from central lines (11, 21) towards both ends. One side has a plug (13) or tongues projecting from it. The clip is positioned between two supports and the plug or tongues fit into corresponding recesses in the drawer, etc.

Abstract (de)

Ein Beschlag zum Befestigen von Körben, Schalen oder Tablaren zwischen vertikalen Schenkeln von stehenden Rahmen bei Hochschrankauszügen besteht aus einem im wesentlichen plattenförmigen Grundkörper (10) mit einer zur Anlage und zum Festlegen am vertikalen Schenkel des Rahmens (4) vorgesehenen Anlagefläche (11). Die Anlagefläche (11) des Grundkörpers (10) weist zwei satteldachartig zueinander stehende Teilflächen (16, 17) auf, wobei die Knicklinie (18) zwischen den beiden Teilflächen (16, 17) horizontal verläuft. An der der Anlagefläche (11) des Grundkörpers (10) abgewandten Außenseite (12) sind gegenüber dieser vorspringende Zapfen (13) oder Leisten (31) angeordnet, die gegen den anderen Schenkel gerichtet sind. Diese Zapfen (13) oder Leisten (31) sind in an einem Korb, einer Schale oder einem Tablar vorgesehenen, zur Form und Größe der Zapfen (13) oder Leisten (31) korrespondierenden Ausnehmungen formschlüssig einzugreifen bestimmt. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47B 88/04; A47B 57/48; A47B 57/30

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47B 57/30 (2006.01); A47B 57/48 (2006.01); A47B 57/50 (2006.01); A47B 88/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47B 57/50 (2013.01); A47B 57/30 (2013.01); A47B 57/487 (2013.01); A47B 88/42 (2017.01); A47B 2088/421 (2017.01)

Citation (applicant)

DE 3408575 A1 19850912 - HERMANN LUENING GMBH & CO MOEB [DE]

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE FR IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 1033093 A1 20000906

INPADOC legal status


2004-12-29 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040622

2003-03-26 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030207

2001-05-23 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT CH DE FR IT LI

2001-01-24 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001130

2000-09-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR IT LI

2000-09-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI