Global Patent Index - EP 1033099 A2

EP 1033099 A2 2000-09-06 - Device for cooling drinking bottles

Title (en)

Device for cooling drinking bottles

Title (de)

Neue Vorrichtung zum Kühlen von Getränkeflaschen

Title (fr)

Dispositif de refroidissement de bouteilles

Publication

EP 1033099 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00102926 A

Priority

DE 19907680 A

Abstract (en)

The device has an outer vessel (1) and an insert (2), whereby the outer vessel is essentially in the form of a tub and the insert has a foot (22) and an approximately cylindrical attachment (21) closed at the bottom and suitable for holding a drink bottle (4). The foot and the attachment are either directly joined together or rigidly or movably connected via a connecting element.

Abstract (de)

Eine Vorrichtung zum Kühlen von Getränkeflaschen bestehend aus einem äußeren Kübel-förmigen Gefäß (1) und einem in dieses äußere Gefäß einstellbaren Einsatzes (2), wobei der Einsatz (2) einen Fuß (22) und einen nach unten hin geschlossenen, etwa zylinderförmigen Aufsatz (21) aufweist, der zur Aufnahme einer Getränkeflasche geeignet ist, bietet eine vereinfachte Handhabung beim Kaltstellen von Getränkeflaschen. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47G 23/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47G 23/02 (2006.01); F25D 31/00 (2006.01); F25D 3/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47G 23/0241 (2013.01); F25D 31/007 (2013.01); F25D 3/08 (2013.01); F25D 2303/081 (2013.01); F25D 2331/803 (2013.01); F25D 2331/809 (2013.01); F25D 2500/02 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19907680 A1 20000831; EP 1033099 A2 20000906; EP 1033099 A3 20001108

INPADOC legal status


2002-03-13 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20010509

2001-08-30 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2001-07-25 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2000-11-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-08 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-11-08 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7A 47G 23/04 A, 7F 25D 31/00 B

2000-09-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-09-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI