Global Patent Index - EP 1033105 A2

EP 1033105 A2 2000-09-06 - Cleaning apparatus

Title (en)

Cleaning apparatus

Title (de)

Reinigungsgerät

Title (fr)

Dispositif de nettoyage

Publication

EP 1033105 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00103627 A

Priority

  • DE 19907574 A
  • DE 29903196 U

Abstract (en)

Cleaning device consists of a handle (3) and a holder for a wiping body (30). The handle end is arranged on the holder by means of a (semi)cardanic hinge (4) and the handle can be tilted. The handle and the handle end are inserted into a locking device formed on the holder.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft ein Reinigungsgerät (1), bestehend aus einem Stiel (3) und einer Halterung (5,8) für einen, insbesondere austauschbaren, Wischkörper (30), wobei das Stielende mittels eines kardanischen bzw. halbkardanischen Gelenks (4) an der Halterung (5,8) angeordnet ist, wodurch der Stiel (3) schwenkbar gelagert ist. Der Erfindung liegt die Aufgabe zugrunde, ein Reinigungsgerät zu schaffen, bei dem der Stiel sowohl beim Abstellen oder Nichtgebrauch auf einfache Weise fixiert wird. Gelöst wird die Aufgabe dadurch, daß der Stiel bzw. das Stielende (13) durch Verschwenkung in eine an der Halterung ausgebildete Arretierungseinrichtung (14) einbringbar ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47L 13/253; A47L 13/24

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47L 13/24 (2006.01); A47L 13/253 (2006.01); A47L 13/254 (2006.01); B25G 3/38 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B25G 3/38 (2013.01); A47L 13/24 (2013.01); A47L 13/253 (2013.01); A47L 13/254 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1033105 A2 20000906; EP 1033105 A3 20010214

INPADOC legal status


2004-03-17 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030902

2001-10-31 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-10-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010807

2001-02-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-02-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-09-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-09-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI