Global Patent Index - EP 1033106 A2

EP 1033106 A2 2000-09-06 - Apparatus for wringing cleaning implements, in particular mops

Title (en)

Apparatus for wringing cleaning implements, in particular mops

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zum Auspressen von Reinigungsgeräten, insbesondere von ausgespannten Wischmops

Title (fr)

Appareil pour essorer des ustensiles de nettoyage, en particulier des balais

Publication

EP 1033106 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00100599 A

Priority

DE 29903806 U

Abstract (en)

The device for wringing out a mop comprises a box-shaped frame (13) with a pressure plate (14) which is moved against a counter-pressure plate (15) by an actuating shaft (16). A non-linear transmission system (17, 18) is arranged between the shaft and the pressure plate which produces immediate closure of the device when it is actuated but which only allows it to close slowly when the gap between plates is around the thickness of the mop.

Abstract (de)

Vorrichtung zum Auspressen eines aufgespannten Wischmobs, umfassend einen kastenartigen Rahmen mit zwei Seitenteilen, wobei zwischen den Seitenteilen eine Druckplatte, eine Gegendruckplatte und eine Druckwelle angeordnet sind. Zwischen der Druckwelle und der Druckplatte ist eine nichtlineare Übersetzungseinrichtung angeordnet, die derart ausgebildet ist, daß sich die Druckplatte zunächst vergleichsweise schnell in Richtung auf die Gegendruckplatte annähert und bei einer Beabstandung von Druckplatte und Gegendruckplatte von ungefähr der Stärke des vollgesogenen Reinigungsgerätes nur noch äußerst langsam erfolgt. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47L 13/59

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47L 13/59 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47L 13/59 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1033106 A2 20000906; EP 1033106 A3 20020529; DE 29903806 U1 20000831

INPADOC legal status


2005-04-27 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18W

- Effective date: 20050303

2004-12-15 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20041103

2003-02-19 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-01-08 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20021108

2002-05-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-05-29 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-09-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-09-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI