Global Patent Index - EP 1033124 A1

EP 1033124 A1 2000-09-06 - PACKAGED OPHTHALMIC PERFUSATE AND CLEANING FLUID BAG

Title (en)

PACKAGED OPHTHALMIC PERFUSATE AND CLEANING FLUID BAG

Title (de)

VERPACKUNG MIT OPHTALMISCHEN PERFUSAT UND REINIGUNGSFLÜSSIGKEIT

Title (fr)

SACHET DE PERFUSAT OPHTALMIQUE ET DE FLUIDE NETTOYANT CONDITIONNE

Publication

EP 1033124 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98950367 A

Priority

  • JP 9804814 W
  • JP 29431097 A
  • JP 31308397 A

Abstract (en)

A packaged ocular irrigating solution bag, which comprises a gas-permeable plastic multiple compartment bag and a gas-impermeable plastic packaging member for packaging the bag and in which an oxiglutatione-containing solution or solid preparation is enclosed in one compartment and a bicarbonate ion solution is enclosed in another compartment and the space between the bag and the packaging member has a carbon dioxide gas atmosphere. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61J 1/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61J 1/00 (2006.01); A61J 1/05 (2006.01); A61J 1/10 (2006.01); A61F 9/007 (2006.01); A61J 1/16 (2006.01); A61J 1/20 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61J 1/10 (2013.01); A61J 1/1462 (2013.01); A61F 9/007 (2013.01); A61J 1/16 (2013.01); A61J 1/2024 (2015.05); A61J 1/2093 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

US 2004123563 A1 20040701; US 7047708 B2 20060523; AT 407652 T 20080915; CA 2307162 A1 19990506; CA 2307162 C 20060321; CN 1187031 C 20050202; CN 1277547 A 20001220; DE 69840003 D1 20081023; EP 1033124 A1 20000906; EP 1033124 A4 20040414; EP 1033124 B1 20080910; ES 2313753 T3 20090301; HK 1033257 A1 20050603; JP 3060133 U 19990730; KR 100381326 B1 20030423; US 6764481 B1 20040720; WO 9921527 A1 19990506

INPADOC legal status


2017-02-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20161024

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20161018

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-01-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20161019

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-12-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20160913

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160919

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-09-19 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-09-08 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 18

2010-10-29 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20081211

2010-07-30 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20080910

2010-06-30 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081023

2010-01-29 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20081210

2009-10-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081031

2009-10-30 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081023

2009-10-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081031

2009-08-19 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20090611

2009-07-31 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20080910

2009-05-29 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081031

2009-05-29 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20080910

2009-05-29 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20090210

2009-05-29 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2009-03-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20080910

2009-03-02 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2009-03-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2313753 T3

2009-02-27 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20080910

2009-02-27 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20080910

2008-10-23 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69840003 P 20081023

2008-10-15 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2008-09-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2008-09-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2008-09-10 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2006-12-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20061106

2004-04-14 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20040302

2004-04-07 [D17D] SEARCH REPORT (DELETED)

2000-09-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000427

2000-09-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE