Global Patent Index - EP 1033148 A2

EP 1033148 A2 2000-09-06 - Device for the strengthening of facial muscles

Title (en)

Device for the strengthening of facial muscles

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zur Stärkung der Gesichtsmuskulatur

Title (fr)

Dispositif destiné à développer la musculature du visage

Publication

EP 1033148 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00104235 A

Priority

DE 19908722 A

Abstract (en)

The muscle-strengthening appliance (1) consists of dish-shaped elements (2,3) at least partly gripping round the top and bottom jaws and connected to a spring element (4). The spring element consists of a plate or leg spring (5) whose arms include an angle of 40 degrees roughly when open. The swivel axle part (5a) of the plate or leg spring points to the interior of the mouth. The spring element has an outward-pointing flat extension (4a) and is stuck by adhesive surfaces (6) to the dish-shaped elements.

Abstract (de)

Zur Stärkung der Gesichtsmuskulatur, insbesondere der Kiefer- und Mundmuskeln, wird eine Vorrichtung (1) vorgeschlagen, wobei den Ober- und Unterkiefer zumindest teilweise umgreifende Schalenelemente (2, 3) vorgesehen sind, die mit einem Federelement (4) verbunden sind. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A63B 23/03

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A63B 23/03 (2006.01); A63B 21/045 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A63B 23/032 (2013.01); A63B 21/045 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

None

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1033148 A2 20000906; EP 1033148 A3 20020612; DE 19908722 A1 20000907

INPADOC legal status


2006-07-12 [R18D] EP-APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN: (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: R18D

- Effective date: 20060110

2005-03-23 [D18D] EP-APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN: (DELETED)

- Ref Legal Event Code: D18D

2004-12-22 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20041110

2003-04-23 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20030306

2003-03-05 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-02-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20021212

2002-06-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-06-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-09-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-09-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI