Global Patent Index - EP 1033151 A2

EP 1033151 A2 2000-09-06 - Exercising apparatus

Title (en)

Exercising apparatus

Title (de)

Übungsgerät

Title (fr)

Appareil pour effectuer des exercices physiques

Publication

EP 1033151 A2 (FR)

Application

EP 00400576 A

Priority

FR 9902694 A

Abstract (en)

The physical exercise apparatus has a frame (2) with a central beam (3) supporting a slidable seat (6) and footrests (7). Arms (8a,b) are connected to the sides of the beam by resistances (12a,b). The arms have handgrips (11) placed adjacent to the vertical plane containing the middle axis of the beam.

Abstract (fr)

Dans cet appareil comprenant un bâti (2) incluant une poutre centrale (3) longitudinale pouvant être placée sensiblement en position horizontale en service, un siège (6) monté coulissant sur ladite poutre, des moyens d'appui (7) pour les pieds de l'utilisateur, qui sont liés à la poutre vers son extrémité avant, un levier articulé (8a, 8b) prévu sur au moins un côté de la poutre, et un moyen résistant (12a, 12b) qui relie ledit levier (8a, 8b) au bâti (2) pour freiner le déplacement du levier commandé par l'utilisateur, ledit levier (8a, 8b) pouvant pivoter autour d'un axe de pivotement (9a, 9b) horizontal ou sensiblement horizontal, l'axe de pivotement (9a, 9b) du levier (8a, 8b) fait un angle () prédéterminé, inférieur à 90°, avec l'axe médian longitudinal (20) de ladite poutre centrale longitudinale (3), de telle façon que l'extrémité libre du levier (8a, 8b), munie d'une poignée (11a, 11b) pouvant être saisie par l'utilisateur, se trouve dans ou à proximité immédiate du plan vertical contenant l'axe médian longitudinal (20) de ladite poutre (3), quand le levier (8a, 8b) est poussé dans sa position extrême avant, et est écarté dudit plan vertical quand ledit levier est tiré dans sa position extrême arrière. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A63B 69/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A63B 69/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A63B 22/0076 (2013.01); A63B 2022/0084 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1033151 A2 20000906; EP 1033151 A3 20030326; FR 2790397 A1 20000908; FR 2790397 B1 20040312

INPADOC legal status


2004-06-30 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030927

2004-01-29 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2003-12-17 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2003-03-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-03-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-03-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2000-09-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-09-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI