Global patent index - EP 1033152 A1

EP 1033152 A1 2000-09-06 - Measuring device for impacts, in particular blows in fighting sports

Title (en)

Measuring device for impacts, in particular blows in fighting sports

Title (de)

Messeinrichtung für Schläge bzw. Treffer bei Kampfsportarten

Title (fr)

Dispositif de mesure d'impacts en particulier dans les sports de combats

Publication

EP 1033152 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99103272 A

Priority

EP 99103272 A

Abstract (en)

The invention relates to a measuring device for measuring hits or strikes which occur during activities involving martial arts, in particular, a protective vest for taekwondo. The inventive device comprises a layer (1) made of polyurethane which has a multitude of gas-filled, compressible, tubular cavities (2) which open into at least one collecting chamber (3), whereby the cavities (2) have a throttle-like diminished cross-section in the transition area (4) leading into the collecting chamber (3). The variations in pressure resulting from the acting forces in the cavities (2) are measured by a pressure measuring device (6).

Abstract (de)

Meßeinrichtung für Schläge bzw. Treffer bei Kampfsportarten, insbesondere Schutzweste für Taekwondo, mit einer zumindest einen gasgefüllten, komprimierbaren Hohlraum (2) aufweisenden Schicht (1) zur Messung der einwirkenden Kräfte, wobei die durch die einwirkenden Kräfte im Hohlraum (2) entstehenden Druckschwankungen mittels einer Druckmeßeinrichtung (6) gemessen werden. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A63B 71/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A63B 71/06 (2006.01); A63B 21/008 (2006.01); A63B 69/00 (2006.01); A63B 69/32 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A63B 71/0605 (2013.01); A63B 21/008 (2013.01); A63B 69/004 (2013.01); A63B 2220/53 (2013.01); A63B 2220/56 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

None

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE DE ES FR GB GR IT NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1033152 A1 20000906; EP 1033152 B1 20011219; AT 211010 T 20020115; AU 2894600 A 20000904; DE 59900580 D1 20020131; ES 2166626 T3 20020416; PT 1033152 E 20020429; WO 0048692 A1 20000824

INPADOC legal status

2005-05-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20040220

2005-02-19 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050219

2004-12-03 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

2004-11-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLV4

- Effective date: 20040901

2004-10-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041029

2004-10-06 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20040219

2004-09-28 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EUG

2004-09-03 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040903

2004-09-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040901

2004-09-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040901

2004-08-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *ALT NORBERT

- Ref Legal Event Code: BERE

- Effective date: 20040228

2004-08-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *TRABESINER JOHANN

- Ref Legal Event Code: BERE

- Effective date: 20040228

2004-08-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *MOSER HUBERT

- Ref Legal Event Code: BERE

- Effective date: 20040228

2004-08-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *HAMMERER KARL HEINZ

- Ref Legal Event Code: BERE

- Effective date: 20040228

2004-08-31 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040831

2004-02-28 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040228

2004-02-20 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040220

2004-02-20 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040220

2004-02-19 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040219

2004-02-19 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040219

2003-03-27 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20030327

- Year of fee payment: 5

2003-03-05 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20030305

- Year of fee payment: 5

2003-02-28 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20030228

- Year of fee payment: 5

2003-02-25 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20030225

- Year of fee payment: 5

2003-02-25 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20030225

- Year of fee payment: 5

2003-02-25 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20030225

- Year of fee payment: 5

2003-02-14 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20030214

- Year of fee payment: 5

2003-02-14 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20030214

- Year of fee payment: 5

2003-02-13 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20030213

- Year of fee payment: 5

2003-01-27 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20030127

- Year of fee payment: 5

2002-12-11 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2002-07-31 [REG GR EP] EP PATENT VALIDATED IN GREECE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

- Ref Document Number: 20020400998

- Country of Ref Document: GR

2002-04-29 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Ref Legal Event Code: SC4A

- Free Format Text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20011220

2002-04-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2166626

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2002-03-29 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2002-01-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59900580

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2002-01-31

2002-01-09 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20011219

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-12-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE ES FR GB GR IT NL PT SE

2001-12-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: SI PAYMENT 20000620

2001-12-19 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 211010

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Date of Ref Document: 2002-01-15

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

2001-05-23 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE DE ES FR GB GR IT NL PT SE

2001-05-23 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AXX

- Free Format Text: SI PAYMENT 20000620

2000-09-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19990831

2000-09-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE ES FR GB GR IT NL PT SE

2000-09-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI PAYMENT 20000620