Global patent index - EP 1033159 A3

EP 1033159 A3 2000-11-29 - Toy comprising a self-moving toy-figure

Title (en)

Toy comprising a self-moving toy-figure

Title (de)

Spielzeug mit einer selbstbewegenden Spielzeugfigur

Title (fr)

Jouet comportant une figurine qui bouge de façon automatique

Publication

EP 1033159 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 00200778 A

Priority

IB 9900379 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1033159A2] A toy comprises a toy-figure (2) having a structure formed by two parts (3, 4) connected together by a joint (5) in such a way as to be capable of relative motion, an assembly for articulating the two parts (3, 4) of the toy-figure (2) upon activation of an electric motor (8), a microphone (28) for detecting a sound signal and command and control means (29) for generating a supply signal so that the motor (8) is supplied as a function of the detected sound signal. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A63H 13/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A63H 13/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A63H 13/00 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1033159 A2 20000906; EP 1033159 A3 20001129; AU 2541299 A 20000921; WO 0051698 A1 20000908

INPADOC legal status

2002-03-06 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20010530

2001-09-20 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2001-08-16 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

2000-11-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-29 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-09-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-09-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI