Global patent index - EP 1033170 A2

EP 1033170 A2 2000-09-06 - Process and apparatus for reclaiming fine sand from a floating mining machine

Title (en)

Process and apparatus for reclaiming fine sand from a floating mining machine

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Rückgewinnung von Feinsand von einem schwimmenden Gewinnungsgerät

Title (fr)

Procédé et dispositif de récupération de sable fin à partir d'une machine d'exploitation flottante

Publication

EP 1033170 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99125284 A

Priority

DE 19900279 A

Abstract (en)

The excavated material has the water extracted and is then brought by floating conveying belts onto land. A blind base is installed beneath the draining screen of a screening machine to collect up the mixture of water and fine sand which is then ejected in the delivery direction and taken up in a wash trough forming the separating bed of a hydro-belt separator. Independent claim describes device with draining screen and blind base (5) covering entire surface beneath draining cover (4). An ejector (8) leads to a hydro-belt separator (9) which comprises an endless conveyor belt (10) with wash trough (11) and rising part (12) leading away from same.

Abstract (de)

Das Verfahren dient zur Rückgewinnung von Feinsand von einem schwimmenden Gewinnungsgerät als Schwimmgreifer 25 oder schwimmenden Eimerkettenbagger 22, wobei das gebaggerte Gut entwässert und über schwimmende Förderbänder 2,3 an Land gebracht wird. Das gebaggerte Material wird einer Entwässerungssiebmaschine 1 übergeben, wobei die Siebmaschine 1 ein Entwässerungsdeck 4 mit einem Entwässerungsbelag aufweist. Die Siebmaschine 1 besitzt unter dem Entwässerungsdeck 4 einen die gesamte Fläche abdeckenden Blindboden 5, wobei in Förderrichtung 6 der Endbereich mit einem Austrag 8 versehen ist. Der Austrag 8 ist zu einem Hydro-Bandscheider 9 gerichtet, der ein umlaufendes endloses Förderband 10 mit einer Waschmulde 11 als Trennbett und einen von der Waschmulde 11 wegführenden ansteigenden Teil 12 aufweist. Die Laufrichtung 13 des Förderbandes 10 erfolgt in Richtung des Anstiegs, wobei das Baggergut am Austrag 8 der Siebmaschine 1 der Waschmulde 11 des Hydro-Bandscheiders 9 übergeben wird. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B03B 9/00; E02F 7/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B03B 9/00 (2006.01); E02F 7/02 (2006.01); E02F 7/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B03B 9/00 (2013.01); E02F 7/023 (2013.01); E02F 7/065 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH FR IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 1033170 A2 20000906; EP 1033170 A3 20021218; DE 19900279 C1 20010201; US 6533944 B1 20030318

INPADOC legal status

2007-01-10 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20060701

2003-10-16 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2003-09-17 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Ref Legal Event Code: RBV

- Designated State(s): AT CH FR IT LI

2003-09-10 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY LI

2002-12-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-12-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-03-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010129

2000-09-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-09-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI