Global Patent Index - EP 1033172 A1

EP 1033172 A1 2000-09-06 - Centrifuge with pneumatic drive and filtration of the atmosphere of its enclosure

Title (en)

Centrifuge with pneumatic drive and filtration of the atmosphere of its enclosure

Title (de)

Zentrifuge mit Pneumatikantrieb und Filtration ihrer Gehäuseatmosphäre

Title (fr)

Centrifugeuse à entraînement pneumatique et à filtration de l'atmosphère de son enceinte

Publication

EP 1033172 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 00400309 A

Priority

FR 9902511 A

Abstract (en)

The centrifuge has a pneumatically driven rotor within a chamber. The pressurized gas used to drive the rotor passes through an aspiration unit that draws gas through the chamber and then through a purification unit. The chamber may be supplied with chilled gas produced by a Rankine tube. The gas enters the chamber beneath the centrifuge rotor. The aspiration unit may be a Venturi injector using the pressurized gas to entrain the gas from the purification unit. The unit has a filter or chemical treatment of the gas. The rotor is driven by a turbine.

Abstract (fr)

Cette centrifugeuse comprend une enceinte (5), un rotor (6) disposé dans celle-ci, et des moyens (8) d'entraînement en rotation du rotor. Les moyens (8) d'entraînement en rotation du rotor sont des moyens pneumatiques d'entraînement, la centrifugeuse comprenant un circuit d'alimentation desdits moyens pneumatiques d'entraînement en gaz sous pression destiné à être raccordé à une source de gaz sous pression (49). La centrifugeuse comprend en outre une unité (10) de purification de gaz, une entrée de cette unité étant raccordée à une sortie (64) de soutirage de gaz de l'enceinte et une sortie de cette unité étant raccordée à un dispositif d'aspiration (21) commandé par le gaz sous pression alimentant les moyens pneumatiques (8) d'entraînement du rotor. Application à la centrifugation de produits susceptibles de libérer des substances dangereuses, par exemple toxiques ou explosives. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B04B 9/06; B04B 7/06; B04B 9/08; B04B 15/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B04B 5/02 (2006.01); B04B 7/06 (2006.01); B04B 9/06 (2006.01); B04B 9/08 (2006.01); B04B 15/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B04B 7/06 (2013.01); B04B 9/06 (2013.01); B04B 9/08 (2013.01); B04B 15/02 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1033172 A1 20000906; EP 1033172 B1 20050817; DE 60021936 D1 20050922; DE 60021936 T2 20060608; FR 2790406 A1 20000908; FR 2790406 B1 20010601; JP 2000246145 A 20000912; JP 3398782 B2 20030421; US 6241650 B1 20010605

INPADOC legal status


2017-05-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20170201

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-04-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170131

- Year of fee payment: 18

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100203

2009-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20090212

- Year of fee payment: 10

2006-07-26 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20060518

2005-10-19 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20050926

2005-09-22 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60021936 P 20050922

2005-08-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE GB IT

2005-08-17 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2001-05-23 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE GB IT

2001-04-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010226

2000-09-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE GB IT

2000-09-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI