Global Patent Index - EP 1033173 A1

EP 1033173 A1 2000-09-06 - Centrifuge with Ranque tube cooling

Title (en)

Centrifuge with Ranque tube cooling

Title (de)

Zentrifuge mit Kühlung mittels Ranque-Rohr

Title (fr)

Centrifugeuse à refroidissement par tube de Ranque

Publication

EP 1033173 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 00400470 A

Priority

FR 9902512 A

Abstract (en)

The centrifuge (1) has a Ranque tube (30) chilling pressurized gas supplied to a rotor chamber. The chilled gas enters the fluid tight chamber (5) beneath the centrifuge rotor (6). The rotor (6) is driven by pressurized gas. An aspiration unit with a Venturi injector uses the pressurized gas to entrain the gas from a purification unit (10) that filters or chemically treats gas drawn out from the chamber (5).

Abstract (fr)

Cette centrifugeuse comprend une enceinte (5), un rotor (6) disposé dans celle-ci, des moyens (8) d'entraînement en rotation du rotor, et des moyens (11) de refroidissement de l'atmosphère de l'enceinte. Les moyens de refroidissement de l'atmosphère de l'enceinte comprennent un tube de Ranque (30) dont une sortie froide (33) est raccordée à une entrée (66) de l'enceinte. La centrifugeuse comprend un circuit d'alimentation en gaz sous pression qui est raccordé à une entrée (32) du tube de Ranque et qui est destiné à être raccordé à une source (49) de gaz sous pression. Application à la centrifugation de produits biologiques. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B04B 15/02; B04B 7/06; B04B 9/06; B04B 9/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B04B 5/02 (2006.01); B04B 7/06 (2006.01); B04B 9/06 (2006.01); B04B 9/08 (2006.01); B04B 15/02 (2006.01); F25B 9/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B04B 15/02 (2013.01); B04B 7/06 (2013.01); B04B 9/06 (2013.01); B04B 9/08 (2013.01); F25B 9/04 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1033173 A1 20000906; EP 1033173 B1 20050810; DE 60021782 D1 20050915; DE 60021782 T2 20060420; FR 2790407 A1 20000908; FR 2790407 B1 20010601; JP 2000246146 A 20000912; JP 3398783 B2 20030421; US 6334841 B1 20020101

INPADOC legal status


2013-06-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120901

2013-01-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120221

2012-12-20 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 60021782

- Effective date: 20120901

2012-10-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20120221

2011-07-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20110216

- Year of fee payment: 12

2011-05-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20110216

- Year of fee payment: 12

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100221

2009-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20090204

- Year of fee payment: 10

2006-07-19 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20060511

2005-12-07 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20051116

2005-09-15 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60021782 P 20050915

2005-08-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE GB IT

2005-08-10 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2001-05-23 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE GB IT

2001-04-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010226

2000-09-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE GB IT

2000-09-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI