Global Patent Index - EP 1033178 A2

EP 1033178 A2 2000-09-06 - Masking member

Title (en)

Masking member

Title (de)

Abdeckungselement

Title (fr)

Dispositif de masquage

Publication

EP 1033178 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00111088 A

Priority

EP 93921092 A

Abstract (en)

An object of the present invention is to repeatedly use a masking member which is applied in a surface treatment having a heating process at a high temperature. To attain the object, the masking member of the present invention uses an engineering plastic having a high mechanical strength and a high heat resistance as a material.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B05B 15/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B05B 15/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B05B 15/0462 (2013.01); B05B 15/045 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 1033178 A2 20000906; EP 1033178 A3 20020605; EP 1033178 B1 20060215

INPADOC legal status


2010-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090929

2010-07-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100401

2010-07-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090930

2010-06-25 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20100531

2010-05-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20090929

2009-06-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20081001

- Year of fee payment: 16

2009-01-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20081002

- Year of fee payment: 16

2008-11-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20080915

- Year of fee payment: 16

2007-01-24 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20061116

2006-12-27 [RAP4] CORRECTION OF NAME OR ADDRESS OF PATENT OWNER (B DOCUMENT)

- Owner name: NAGOYA OILCHEMICAL CO., LTD.

2006-09-22 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2006-04-20 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69333981 P 20060420

2006-02-15 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 0676246 P

2006-02-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2006-02-15 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2003-02-26 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2003-01-08 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20021127

2002-06-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-09-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000605

2000-09-06 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 676246

2000-09-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE