Global Patent Index - EP 1033179 A2

EP 1033179 A2 2000-09-06 - Electroacoustic transducer arrangement

Title (en)

Electroacoustic transducer arrangement

Title (de)

Elektroakustische Wandleranordnung

Title (fr)

Dispositif transducteur électroacoustique

Publication

EP 1033179 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99123728 A

Priority

DE 19909485 A

Abstract (en)

An electroacoustic transducer arrangement for sending and/or receiving sound waves, consists of at least two transducer elements, with a piezoelectric ceramic member, and front and rear mass members. The transducer elements (11,12) have separate front mass sections (14,14') and a common rear mass (10). The latter has a wave absorption construction.

Abstract (de)

Mehrere Wandlerelemente aus piezoelektrischen Keramikkörpern (13) mit Front- (14) und Rückmasse (10) nach Art eines Tonpilzes werden als Wandleranordnung zusammen auf einenTräger montiert. Um eine federnde Verbindung zwischen Träger und Front- und/oder Rückmasse des Wandlerelements zu vermeiden, weisen alle Wandlerelemente erfindungsgemäß eine gemeinsame Rückmasse mit einem Biegewellenabsorberaufbau (101,102,103) auf, die fest mit dem Träger mechanisch verbunden ist. Der Keramikkörper (13) besteht aus dünnen Keramikscheiben und gewährleistet eine Leistungsanpassung an die speisende Spannungsquelle ohne Anpaßtransformator. Durch einen Vollumguß (17) aus Elastomer ist die Wandleranordnung wasserdicht. Die erfindungsgemäße Wandleranordnung ist mit Vorteil vorzugsweise über Steckverbindungen (18,19) als Stave für eine Zylinderbasis eine Hufeisenbasis oder ebene Basis zum Senden und/oder Empfangen von Schallwellen einsetzbar. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B06B 1/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B06B 1/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B06B 1/0618 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DK FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1033179 A2 20000906; EP 1033179 A3 20011017; EP 1033179 B1 20080102; DE 19909485 C1 20001130; DK 1033179 T3 20080310; NO 20001048 A 20000905; NO 20001048 D0 20000301; NO 316349 B1 20040112

INPADOC legal status


2017-10-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20161130

2017-08-25 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20170731

2017-07-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20161130

2016-02-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20151119

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-01-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20151118

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-11-19 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2013-10-31 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121130

2013-08-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121130

2013-07-08 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

2012-01-31 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20111118

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-03-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20101122

- Year of fee payment: 12

2008-12-10 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20081003

2008-08-01 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2008-03-10 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2008-02-27 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20080206

2008-01-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DK FR GB IT

2008-01-02 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2007-05-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20060215

2003-10-29 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ATLAS ELEKTRONIK GMBH

2002-08-08 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2002-07-03 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DK FR GB IT

2002-05-08 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020301

2001-10-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-10-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-09-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DK FR GB IT

2000-09-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-09-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI