Global Patent Index - EP 1033183 A2

EP 1033183 A2 2000-09-06 - Cluster mill

Title (en)

Cluster mill

Title (de)

Vielwalzengerüst

Title (fr)

Laminoir à cylindres multiples

Publication

EP 1033183 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99105914 A

Priority

  • DE 19910341 A
  • DE 19858021 A

Abstract (en)

Cluster mill has two working rolls (19-20) each connected to an intermediate roll and a support roll. The rolls (1-20) and the rolls (A-J) form a 30 roll system.

Abstract (de)

Es wird ein Vielwalzengerüst mit zwei Arbeitswalzen, denen je ein Zwischenwalzensatz und ein Stützrollensatz zugeordnet sind, beschrieben, das als 30-Rollen-Gerüst konzipiert ist. Diese Einrichtung erlaubt vielfältige Anwendungsmöglichkeiten. Es lassen sich damit vorrangig Bänder mit dünnster Enddicke und hoher Bandbreite bei hoher Bandgeschwindigkeit unter Einhaltung engster Bandtoleranzen und optimaler Bandplanheit kaltwalzen. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B21B 13/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B21B 13/14 (2006.01); B21B 13/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B21B 13/147 (2013.01); B21B 13/001 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1033183 A2 20000906; EP 1033183 A3 20020529

INPADOC legal status


2005-02-23 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040824

2004-03-31 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040211

2003-02-19 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT DE

2003-01-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20021128

2002-05-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-05-29 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-09-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-09-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI