Global Patent Index - EP 1033188 A1

EP 1033188 A1 2000-09-06 - Process for fabricating an envelope

Title (en)

Process for fabricating an envelope

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Herstellung eines Umschlags

Title (fr)

Procédé de formage d'une enveloppe

Publication

EP 1033188 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 00400185 A

Priority

FR 9902235 A

Abstract (en)

A spherical metal chamber is produced by internal pressure at cryogenic temperature from a blank made from sheet metal e.g. austenitic stainless steel. The blank is made from at least two or three expandable sections such as a central cylindrical section (8) and two truncated conical ends (9) and is formed into a sphere by internal pressure produced by liquid nitrogen (12) while immersed in an insulated vat (1) of the same substance. During the procedure the blank is suspended by a coupling (6) from the vat lid (2) and is connected by a second coupling (7) to a sliding guide frame (4) beneath it.

Abstract (fr)

L'ébauche (5), immergée dans un bain (12) d'azote liquide, et pressurisée intérieurement par de l'azote liquide sous pression (13), pour la réalisation d'une enveloppe finale sensiblement sphérique, est réalisée sous la forme d'un assemblage de cylindres (8) de troncs de cônes (9) et de disques frontaux réalisés à partir de tôles en acier inoxydable. Application notamment à la réalisation de réservoirs de gaz embarqués. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B21D 26/02; B21D 51/24

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B21D 26/02 (2011.01); B21D 26/033 (2011.01); B21D 26/041 (2011.01); B21D 51/08 (2006.01); F17C 1/02 (2006.01); F17C 1/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B21D 26/033 (2013.01); B21D 26/041 (2013.01); B21D 51/08 (2013.01); F17C 1/02 (2013.01); F17C 1/14 (2013.01); F17C 2201/0128 (2013.01); F17C 2201/056 (2013.01); F17C 2203/0604 (2013.01); F17C 2203/0636 (2013.01); F17C 2203/0643 (2013.01); F17C 2203/0648 (2013.01); F17C 2209/21 (2013.01); F17C 2221/014 (2013.01); F17C 2221/017 (2013.01); F17C 2223/0161 (2013.01); F17C 2223/036 (2013.01); F17C 2227/0135 (2013.01); F17C 2270/0197 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE GB IT

EPO simple patent family

FR 2789915 A1 20000825; FR 2789915 B1 20010413; EP 1033188 A1 20000906

INPADOC legal status


2005-04-13 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20041001

2004-06-30 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: PROCESS FOR FABRICATING AN ENVELOPE

2004-06-23 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: PROCESS FOR FABRICATING AN ENVELOPE

2004-02-11 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20031230

2002-04-24 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: L'AIR LIQUIDE, S.A. A DIRECTOIRE ET CONSEIL DE SUR

2001-05-23 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE GB IT

2001-05-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010306

2000-09-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE GB IT

2000-09-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI