Global patent index - EP 1033205 A2

EP 1033205 A2 2000-09-06 - Valve core mounting and dismounting tool

Title (en)

Valve core mounting and dismounting tool

Title (de)

Werkzeug zum Ein- und Ausbau von Ventilkernen

Title (fr)

Outil pour installer ou démonter des noyaux de valve

Publication

EP 1033205 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00301317 A

Priority

JP 8953799 A

Abstract (en)

A tire air valve (core) mounting and dismounting tool (20) includes a tool head portion (21), a shank portion (22) and a grip portion (23). The tool head portion (21) has a slot (32) for seizing and holding a valve core head portion (16), an axial bore (33) for accepting a valve core shaft portion (14) and its enlarged end (14a). The tool head portion (21) also has annular groove (34) formed along a cylindrical peripheral surface thereof. Balls (36) are retained in second bores (35) which are open to the annular groove (34) and also communicate with the axial bore (33) through openings (37) of a reduced diameter to allow the balls (36) to partially protrude into the axial bore (33). A coil spring (38) is anchored and fastened in the annular groove (34) to act to normally bias the ball (36) radially inwards and leave the balls (36) protruding into the axial bore (33). When the balls (36) are hit and pushed down by the valve core shaft's enlarged end (14a), the elasticity of the coil spring (38) allows the balls (36) to move radially outwards, permitting the valve core shaft end (14a) to move deeper beyond the balls (36) and then permitting the balls (36) to restore their biased state, thereby holding the valve core shaft end (14a) against moving back. Thus, the valve core is caught by the tool. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B25B 27/24

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B25B 13/48 (2006.01); B25B 27/24 (2006.01); B60C 25/18 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B25B 27/24 (2013.01); B25B 13/48 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1033205 A2 20000906; EP 1033205 A3 20030416; CA 2299014 A1 20000822; JP 2000237972 A 20000905

INPADOC legal status

2005-03-09 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20040302

2004-01-07 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2003-12-10 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20031009

2003-04-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-04-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Extension state: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2003-04-16 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7B 60C 25/18 A

2000-09-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-09-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI