Global Patent Index - EP 1033206 A2

EP 1033206 A2 2000-09-06 - Device for a spring compressor for aligning the spring plate

Title (en)

Device for a spring compressor for aligning the spring plate

Title (de)

Vorrichtung für Federspanner zum Ausrichten eines Federtellers

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour un compresseur de ressorts pour aligner une coupelle de ressort

Publication

EP 1033206 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00100233 A

Priority

DE 29903826 U

Abstract (en)

The system to tense a coil spring and align the spring plate has a positive fit unit (16,17) at the first grip section (1), for the angular orientation of the upper spring plate (4) in relation to the first grip. They are located so that when the upper spring plate is at a given angular position in relation to the first grip, they engage a part (11,12) of the spring plate in a positive fit with little play. The positive fit units have a holding groove (18,19) aligned radially to the grip, to fit over the projecting pins (14) from the upper surface (9) of the spring plate.

Abstract (de)

Federspanner (150) zum Spannen einer Schraubenfeder (159), welche zwischen einem oberen und einem unteren Federteller (4 und 160) eines Federdämpferbeines (158) von Kraftfahrzeugen unter Vorspannung aufgenommen ist. Der Federspanner (150) weist ein erstes und ein zweiten Greiferelement (1 und 156) auf, welche über ein Führungsrohr (149) des Federspanners (150) koaxial zueinander geführt und relativ zueinander verstellbar sind. Das erste Greiferelement (1) kann ringförmig ausgebildet sein und am oberen Federteller (1) angesetzt werden, während das zweite Greiferelement (156) gabelförmig ausgebildet ist und an einer Federwindung (168) der Schraubenfeder (159) ansetzt wird. Um eine vorgegebene Winkelausrichtung des oberen Federtellers (1) eines Federdämpferbeines (158) relativ zu dessen unterem Lagerauge (147) möglichst einfach durchführen zu können, ist im Bereich des ersten Greiferelementes (1) ein Formschlußelement (16,17) vorgesehen, das in einer vorbestimmten Winkellage des oberen Federtellers (4) zum ersten Greiferelement (1) mit einem Teil (11,12,14,15) des Federtellers (4) in Umfangsrichtung mit geringem Spiel formschlüssig in Eingriff gebracht werden kann. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B25B 27/30

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B25B 27/30 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B25B 27/304 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB

EPO simple patent family

DE 29903826 U1 19990527; DE 50011145 D1 20051020; EP 1033206 A2 20000906; EP 1033206 A3 20010314; EP 1033206 B1 20050914; ES 2245278 T3 20060101

INPADOC legal status


2017-05-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160118

2017-02-24 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20170224

2016-11-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160201

2016-10-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160117

2016-10-28 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20160930

2016-09-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20160117

2016-04-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20151221

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-05-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20150108

- Year of fee payment: 16

2015-05-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20141217

- Year of fee payment: 16

2015-01-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20141210

- Year of fee payment: 16

2006-08-23 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20060615

2006-06-09 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2006-01-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2245278 T3

2005-10-20 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50011145 P 20051020

2005-10-19 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20050923

2005-09-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB

2005-09-14 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-02-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19931219

2001-12-05 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES FR GB

2001-07-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010505

2001-03-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB

2001-03-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-09-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB

2000-09-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI