Global Patent Index - EP 1033206 A3

EP 1033206 A3 2001-03-14 - Device for a spring compressor for aligning the spring plate

Title (en)

Device for a spring compressor for aligning the spring plate

Title (de)

Vorrichtung für Federspanner zum Ausrichten eines Federtellers

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour un compresseur de ressorts pour aligner une coupelle de ressort

Publication

EP 1033206 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 00100233 A

Priority

DE 29903826 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1033206A2] The system to tense a coil spring and align the spring plate has a positive fit unit (16,17) at the first grip section (1), for the angular orientation of the upper spring plate (4) in relation to the first grip. They are located so that when the upper spring plate is at a given angular position in relation to the first grip, they engage a part (11,12) of the spring plate in a positive fit with little play. The positive fit units have a holding groove (18,19) aligned radially to the grip, to fit over the projecting pins (14) from the upper surface (9) of the spring plate.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B25B 27/30

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B25B 27/30 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B25B 27/304 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB

EPO simple patent family

DE 29903826 U1 19990527; DE 50011145 D1 20051020; EP 1033206 A2 20000906; EP 1033206 A3 20010314; EP 1033206 B1 20050914; ES 2245278 T3 20060101

INPADOC legal status


2016-11-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160201

2016-10-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160117

2016-10-28 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20160930

2016-09-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20160117

2016-04-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151221

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-05-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150108

- Year of fee payment: 16

2015-05-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20141217

- Year of fee payment: 16

2015-01-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20141210

- Year of fee payment: 16

2006-08-23 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20060615

2006-06-09 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2006-01-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2245278

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2005-10-20 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 50011145

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2005-10-20

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2005-10-19 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20050923

2005-09-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB

2005-09-14 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-02-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19931219

2001-12-05 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE ES FR GB

2001-07-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010505

2001-03-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB

2001-03-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-09-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB

2000-09-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI