Global Patent Index - EP 1033213 A2

EP 1033213 A2 2000-09-06 - Assembly and method for generating a compacting movement in a concrete product casting machine

Title (en)

Assembly and method for generating a compacting movement in a concrete product casting machine

Title (de)

Vorrichtung und Verfahren zum Erzeugen einer verdichtender Bewegung in einem Gleitfertiger zum Herstellen von Betongegenständen

Title (fr)

Assemblage et méthode pour générer un mouvement de compactage dans un dispositif de moulage de produit en béton

Publication

EP 1033213 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00660038 A

Priority

FI 990451 A

Abstract (en)

The present invention aims to provide a method and apparatus suited for advantageously generating the reciprocating compacting movement needed in a concrete casting machine so as to offer a simple technique of adjusting or changing the amplitude of the compacting movement as required. The invention is based on generating the compacting movement with the help of two rotary shafts (14, 12) of which the primary shaft (14) has a primary eccentric member (18) adapted thereon and the secondary shaft has a secondary eccentric member (20) adapted thereon. The movement of the primary eccentric member (18) is transmitted to the secondary eccentric member (20) by means of a lever (19), whereby the eccentricity of both eccentric members determines the angle of the reciprocating rotation of the secondary shaft (12) and, thus the stroke length of one or more crank levers (11) mounted thereon. The crank levers (11) are connected to the members that are desired to perform a reciprocating movement, e.g., swinging levers (5) moving the core-forming trowel members (4). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B28B 3/22; B28B 1/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B28B 1/08 (2006.01); B30B 1/26 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B28B 1/084 (2013.01); B28B 3/228 (2013.01); B30B 1/266 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1033213 A2 20000906; EP 1033213 A3 20021113; CN 1265962 A 20000913; FI 115618 B 20050615; FI 990451 A0 19990302; FI 990451 A 20000903

INPADOC legal status


2006-04-05 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20051001

2003-07-30 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-07-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20030430

2002-11-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-11-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2002-11-13 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7B 28B 3/22 A, 7B 28B 1/08 B, 7B 30B 1/26 B

2000-09-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-09-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI