Global Patent Index - EP 1033214 A2

EP 1033214 A2 2000-09-06 - Process and device for making fence parts from concrete

Title (en)

Process and device for making fence parts from concrete

Title (de)

Vorrichtung und Verfahren zum Herstellen von Hohlpalisaden aus Beton

Title (fr)

Dispositif et procédé pour la fabrication d'éléments de palissade creux en béton

Publication

EP 1033214 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00103558 A

Priority

DE 19908540 A

Abstract (en)

The production appliance consists of a vertical outer mold (1) with coaxial core (2) removable from the mold. On the side of the outer mold facing away from the base is at least one punch (3) insertable into the outer mold. The outer mold is closed on its side facing the base, and the core on the side facing away from the base is removable from the mold. The outer mold consists of a top (11) and bottom (12) part joined by carriers (111). The core is fixed to the upper mold part and contains a vibrator (21).

Abstract (de)

Die Vorrichtung zum Herstellen von Hohlpalisaden aus Beton hat eine senkrecht stehende Außenform (1). Sie weist einen koaxial angeordneten, aus der Form verfahrbaren Kern (2) auf und ist mit mindestens einer Rüttelvorrichtung (21) versehen. Auf der dem Boden abgewandten Seite ist wenigstens ein Stempel (3) vorgesehen, der in die Außenform (1) verfahrbar ist. Die Außenform (1) ist auf Ihrer dem Boden zugewandten Seite geschlossen und der Kern (2) ist auf der dem Boden abgewandten Seite aus dieser heraus verfahrbar. Die Außenform (1) besteht aus einem Formoberteil (11) und einem Formunterteil (12), die durch Mitnehmer (111) miteinander verbunden sind. Der Kern (2) ist an dem Formoberteil (11) befestigt. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B28B 7/16; B28B 1/093; B28B 3/02; E04H 17/20

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B28B 1/093 (2006.01); B28B 3/02 (2006.01); B28B 7/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B28B 1/0935 (2013.01); B28B 3/022 (2013.01); B28B 7/166 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1033214 A2 20000906; EP 1033214 A3 20020814; DE 19908540 A1 20000914; DE 19908540 C2 20010315

INPADOC legal status


2003-11-12 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030215

2003-06-12 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2003-05-07 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2002-08-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-08-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-04-11 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: SCHWENK LOESCH BETONTECHNIK GMBH. & CO. KG.

2000-09-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-09-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI