Global Patent Index - EP 1033215 A2

EP 1033215 A2 2000-09-06 - Apparatus for moulding a staircase

Title (en)

Apparatus for moulding a staircase

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zum Herstellen von Treppen

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour la fabrication d'un escalier

Publication

EP 1033215 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00103731 A

Priority

GB 9903959 A

Abstract (en)

An apparatus for moulding a staircase includes a plurality of tread and riser mould part assemblies (14) arranged along the apparatus (10), each tread mould part (24) of each assembly (14) extending downwardly from a connection (26) with the riser mould part (25) of the assembly (14), which riser mould part (25) also extends downwardly at an opposite side of the connection (26), the lengths of each of the tread and riser mould parts (24, 25) from their respective connections (26) being adjustable, and the apparatus (10) further including a support structure (16, 17) characterised in that the tread mould part (24) of a first assembly (14) and the riser mould part (25) of an adjacent second assembly (14) are connected to a first bogie means (40) which is movable along the support structure (16, 17) of the apparatus (10), and the riser mould part (25) of the first assembly (14) and the tread mould part (24) of a third adjacent assembly (14) are connected to a second bogie means (41) which is movable along the support structure (16, 17) of the apparatus (10), the lengths of the tread and riser mould parts (24, 25) of the first assembly (14) and of the riser mould part (25) of the second assembly and of the tread mould part (24) of the third assembly (14) being adjustable as the first and second bogie means (40, 41) are moved towards or away from one another. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B28B 7/22; B28B 7/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B28B 7/22 (2006.01); E04F 11/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04F 11/00 (2013.01); B28B 7/225 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

GB 2347106 A 20000830; GB 2347106 B 20030702; GB 9903959 D0 19990414; EP 1033215 A2 20000906; EP 1033215 A3 20010613

INPADOC legal status


2004-06-23 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20031222

2003-04-09 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030220

2002-04-10 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: TARMAC LIMITED

2002-03-06 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-01-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20011030

2001-06-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-06-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-09-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-09-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI