Global Patent Index - EP 1033295 A2

EP 1033295 A2 2000-09-06 - Windscreen wiper assembly

Title (en)

Windscreen wiper assembly

Title (de)

Scheibenwischervorrichtung

Title (fr)

Dispositif d'essuie-glace

Publication

EP 1033295 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00301131 A

Priority

  • GB 9904820 A
  • GB 9906755 A
  • GB 9922420 A

Abstract (en)

A windscreen wiper assembly 1 comprising a pivot shaft 2 mounted in a housing 3 and a safety system comprising means 4, 5, 7 arranged to allow movement of at least the pivot shaft 2 upon application of an impacting force having a component acting along the axis of the pivot shaft 2. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B60S 1/04; B60S 1/34

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B60S 1/04 (2006.01); B60S 1/34 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B60S 1/3436 (2013.01); B60S 1/0488 (2013.01); B60S 1/34 (2013.01); B60S 1/3493 (2013.01); B60S 1/0425 (2013.01); B60S 1/0433 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

GB 2327598 A 19990203 - HONDA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1033295 A2 20000906; EP 1033295 A3 20020515

INPADOC legal status


2005-04-06 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040929

2003-06-11 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030425

2003-03-19 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: TRICO LIMITED

2003-02-05 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-01-08 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20021108

2002-05-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-05-15 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-09-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-09-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI