Global Patent Index - EP 1033311 A2

EP 1033311 A2 2000-09-06 - Paper or plastic bag with tearing tab

Title (en)

Paper or plastic bag with tearing tab

Title (de)

Papier- oder Kunststoffsack mit Aufreisslasche

Title (fr)

Sac en papier ou en matière plastique avec languette d'ouverture

Publication

EP 1033311 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00104303 A

Priority

DE 19909003 A

Abstract (en)

The paper or plastic bag consists of a tube (2) of material which is folded to form closed ends with overlapping sections. A tear strip (7) is attached to at least one of the corner flaps (10) of one end. An Independent claim is included for a process for producing the bag.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft einen Papier- oder Kunststoffsack, insbesondere für pulverförmiges oder körniges Füllgut, aus einem im wesentlichen schlauchartigen Materialabschnitt, der im Bereich mindestens eines seiner beiden axialen Enden zu einem den Sack abschließenden Kreuzboden faltbar ist, wobei der Kreuzboden zwei einander gegenüberliegende Eckeinschläge und zwei Seitenklappen aufweist, wobei die Seitenklappen auf die Eckeinschläge faltbar und zumindest bereichsweise mit diesen und miteinander verklebbar sind. Erfindungsgemäß ist im Bereich mindestens eines Eckeinschlags (10) eine Aufreißlasche (7) am schlauchförmigen Materialabschnitt (2) angeordnet, die bei gefaltetem und verklebtem Kreuzboden von diesem seitlich nach außen ragt, wobei mittels der Aufreißlasche (7) der Eckeinschlag (10) und damit der Sack (1) aufreißbar ist. Vorzugsweise wird die Aufreißlasche (7) durch zwei Einschnitte (6', 6'') in einem der Eckeinschläge (10) gebildet. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65D 5/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65D 30/12 (2006.01); B65D 30/18 (2006.01); B65D 30/24 (2006.01); B65D 33/36 (2006.01); B65D 75/68 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 31/08 (2013.01); B65D 75/68 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1033311 A2 20000906; EP 1033311 A3 20020313; CZ 20000776 A3 20011114; DE 19909003 A1 20000914; DE 19909003 C2 20030508; PL 338768 A1 20000911; SK 3082000 A3 20001009

INPADOC legal status


2003-09-17 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20020914

2003-01-16 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2002-12-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2002-03-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-03-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2002-03-13 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7B 65D 5/06 A, 7B 65D 75/68 B

2000-09-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-09-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI