Global patent index - EP 1033312 A1

EP 1033312 A1 2000-09-06 - Carton box with reinforced tray shaped base

Title (en)

Carton box with reinforced tray shaped base

Title (de)

Kartonschachtel mit versträrktem schalensartigen Untereil

Title (fr)

Boîte en carton a embase renforcée en forme de barquette

Publication

EP 1033312 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00103827 A

Priority

DE 19909312 A

Abstract (en)

The cardboard dish is produced from a single blank which has fold lines such that the corners of the dish produced consist of more than two overlapping layers of card (13, 14, 15) over the whole depth of the dish.

Abstract (de)

Das schalenartige Unterteil (1) einer Faltschachtel wird aus einem einstückigen Faltzuschnitt (2) hergestellt, der aus einem Bodenteil (3) besteht sowie mehreren Seitenteilen (5, 6), die im aufgerichteten Zustand die Seitenwände des Unterteiles (1) bilden. Zur Verbindung der Seitenwände vorgesehene Verbindungslaschen (8) sind so ausgebildet, daß sie beim Zusammenfügen des Unterteiles (1) mehrfach umgeklappt werden, wodurch einige Seitenwände Bereiche mit mehr als zwei überlappenden Schichten Karton aufweisen, die sich vom Bodenteil (3) bis zur Schachtelöffnung erstrecken. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65D 5/44

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65D 5/44 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 5/443 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1033312 A1 20000906; DE 19909312 A1 20000907

INPADOC legal status

2004-03-24 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20030822

2002-01-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20011115

2001-05-23 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-05-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010306

2000-09-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-09-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI