Global Patent Index - EP 1033328 A1

EP 1033328 A1 2000-09-06 - Fibre reinforced plastic tank container

Title (en)

Fibre reinforced plastic tank container

Title (de)

Containertank aus faserverstärktem Kunststoff

Title (fr)

Conteneur-citerne en matière plastique renforcée de fibres

Publication

EP 1033328 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00101519 A

Priority

DE 29903176 U

Abstract (en)

The frame has one or more longitudinal keel beams (12) resting on the floor and holding bracing struts connected to end frames (10). The frames have corner plates (11) and hold profiled ring frames (15) which engage the ends of the tank at the joins between the ends of the cylindrical portion and the dished ends.

Abstract (de)

Für den Transport hochreiner oder sehr aggressiver Medien dient ein in einem herkömmlichen Containerrahmen 10-12 einsetzbarer Kunststofftank 13. An beide Enden des Kunststofftanks sind Zylinderflansche 20 angeformt, die jeweils mit einem zu der betreffenden Stirngruppe 10 des Containerrahmens führenden metallischen Rohrabschnitt verbunden sind. Dabei sind die Zylinderflansche über einen Formschluß, einen Preßsitz 30, eine Klebeverbindung 31 oder Kombinationen daraus mit dem metallischen Rohrabschnitt verbunden. So werden Lasten zwischen dem Tank 13 und dem Containerrahmen 10-12 gleichmäßig und spannungsspitzenarm übertragen und Relativbewegungen zwischen Tank und Rahmen verhindert. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65D 88/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65D 88/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 88/128 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE FR GB NL

EPO simple patent family

DE 29903176 U1 20000706; EP 1033328 A1 20000906; EP 1033328 B1 20041027

INPADOC legal status


2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: WESTERWALDER EISENWERK G.M.B.H. *WEW

- Effective date: 20060131

2006-08-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060801

2006-01-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060131

2005-12-23 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2005-10-19 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050728

2005-05-25 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20041027

2005-05-02 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2005-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20050131

- Year of fee payment: 6

2005-01-25 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20050125

- Year of fee payment: 6

2004-12-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50008376 P 20041202

2004-10-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB NL

2004-10-27 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-10-27 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20041027

2004-10-27 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20041027

2004-10-27 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20041027

2001-05-23 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: BE DE FR GB NL

2001-05-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010306

2000-09-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB NL

2000-09-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI