Global patent index - EP 1033329 A1

EP 1033329 A1 2000-09-06 - Pressure vessel with end-ring

Title (en)

Pressure vessel with end-ring

Title (de)

Druckbehälter mit Stirnring

Title (fr)

Réservoir à pression avec anneau d'extrémité

Publication

EP 1033329 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99120546 A

Priority

DE 29818606 U

Abstract (en)

The container (10) has an elliptical base (12) on whose convex surface (20) is welded a ring (11) located concentric to the container axis (30). The ring is connected to the base of the container in the region of a meridian tension consisting of an over pressure on the inner wall of the container. The ring may be welded to an elliptical base having a half axis ration of 2:1 and has a mean diameter at its welded end of between 0.86 and 0.90 Da (the diameter of the container).

Abstract (de)

Bei einem Druckbehälter (10), der aus einem zylindrischen Mantel (13) und auf- oder eingesetzten Böden (12) besteht, ist im Bereich der maximalen Meridianspannungen in der äußeren Bodenrandzone ein Ring (11) angeschweißt, der die Spannungen in diesem Bereich so stark herabsetzt, daß für eine bestimmten Behälterinnendruck die erforderlichen Wandstärken in diesem Bereich und damit im Bereich des ganzen Bodens gegenüber einem Boden ohne einen solchen Ring erheblich niedriger ausfallen können. Dieser Ring (11) dient entweder nur zur Spannungsreduzierung im Randzonenbereich, oder er dient zusätzlich als Sattelelement bei vertikal oder horizontal angeordneten Druckbehältern (10), insbesondere Tankcontainern, oder er bildet einen weiteren Druckraum (40) zwischen zwei Druckbehältern (10), die koaxial mit den jeweils konvexen Seiten ihrer Böden zueinander angeordnet sind. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65D 88/12; F17C 13/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65D 88/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 88/128 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE FR GB NL

EPO simple patent family

DE 29818606 U1 20000302; EP 1033329 A1 20000906; EP 1033329 B1 20040414

INPADOC legal status

2016-07-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160503

2016-05-03 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 59909176

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2015-08-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150501

2015-08-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141031

2015-07-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141015

2015-07-31 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20150630

2015-06-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20141015

2015-05-20 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: V1

- Effective date: 20150501

2015-04-30 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20141020

- Year of fee payment: 16

2015-01-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20141024

- Year of fee payment: 16

2014-02-28 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20131021

- Year of fee payment: 15

2014-01-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20131022

- Year of fee payment: 15

2014-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20131018

- Year of fee payment: 15

2012-03-05 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 59909176

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: MFG PATENTANWAELTE MEYER-WILDHAGEN MEGGLE-FREU, DE

2005-06-01 [NLS] NL: ASSIGNMENTS OF EP-PATENTS

- Owner name: WEW WESTERWAELDER EISENWERK GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLS

2005-04-06 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20050117

2005-03-02 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: 732E

2005-01-07 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2004-12-01 [NLT2] NL: MODIFICATIONS (OF NAMES), TAKEN FROM THE EUROPEAN PATENT PATENT BULLETIN

- Owner name: WEW WESTERWAELDER EISENWERK GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLT2

2004-09-22 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: WEW WESTERWAELDER EISENWERK GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP2

2004-08-18 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20040728

2004-05-19 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59909176

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2004-05-19

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2004-04-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB NL

2004-04-14 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-04-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20020301

2001-05-23 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: BE DE FR GB NL

2001-05-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010306

2000-09-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB NL

2000-09-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI