Global patent index - EP 1033412 A1

EP 1033412 A1 2000-09-06 - Method and device for dehairing rodent skins

Title (en)

Method and device for dehairing rodent skins

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Enthaaren von Nagetierhäuten

Title (fr)

Procédé et dispositif d'épilage de peaux de rongeurs

Publication

EP 1033412 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 00400566 A

Priority

FR 9902634 A

Abstract (en)

Process for separating the hair from the skins of small rodents involves vigorously beating the rolled-up or open skins in water to detach the hairs, including the bulb portion, and separating the floating hairs from the surface of the water. An Independent claim is also included for an apparatus for separating the hair from the skins of small rodents, comprising means for beating the skins and means for selectively recovering the detached hairs and skins.

Abstract (fr)

Le procédé de séparation des poils de peaux de petits rongeurs, est appliqué à des peaux issues d'abattoirs sous forme de manchons ou de peaux ouvertes, et est caractérisé en ce que il comporte une étape de détachement des poils de la peau au niveau du bulbe par brassage vigoureux dans de l'eau et une étape de séparation des poils détachés et des peaux dans de l'eau par différence de densité. Préférentiellement, l'étape de détachement des poils de la peaux est précédée de phases de fermentation des peaux, puis de gonflage humide. L'invention vise également le dispositif de brassage associé. Application notamment au traitement de peaux de lapin. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C14B 1/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C14B 1/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C14B 1/02 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1033412 A1 20000906; FR 2790482 A1 20000908; FR 2790482 B1 20010511

INPADOC legal status

2003-06-11 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20021127

2001-10-31 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010912

2001-05-23 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-12-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20001016

2000-09-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-09-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI