Global Patent Index - EP 1033413 A2

EP 1033413 A2 2000-09-06 - Quenching device for workpieces

Title (en)

Quenching device for workpieces

Title (de)

Abschreckvorrichtung für Werkstücke

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour la trempe de pièces

Publication

EP 1033413 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00104689 A

Priority

DE 19909478 A

Abstract (en)

Apparatus for chilling workpieces comprises a container (12) containing a quenching medium, in which a press roller (20) is horizontally fixed so that it can rotate. The roller is partially immersed in the quenching medium and is coupled to a control device for its rotation. Several receiving stations (A11, A21, A31, A41) are provided in the peripheral direction. During quenching, a workpiece (36) is held and pressed in each receiving station.

Abstract (de)

Beschrieben wird eine Vorrichtung zum Abschrecken von Werkstücken mit einem ein Abschreckmittel enthaltenden Behälter, in welchem eine Presswalze horizontal und drehbar befestigt, wenigstens teilweise in das Abschreckmittel eingetaucht ist und mehrere in Umfangsrichtung beabstandete Aufnahmestationen aufweist, wobei jede Aufnahmestation jeweils ein Werkstück während des Abschreckens einspannt und presst. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C21D 1/673; C21D 1/63

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C21D 1/63 (2006.01); C21D 1/673 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C21D 1/63 (2013.01); C21D 1/673 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE FR IT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1033413 A2 20000906; EP 1033413 A3 20030730; EP 1033413 B1 20050831; AT 303452 T 20050915; DE 19909478 A1 20001123; DE 19909478 C2 20030410; DE 50011043 D1 20051006

INPADOC legal status


2009-09-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070303

2008-07-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070402

2008-01-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071002

2008-01-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20060324

- Year of fee payment: 7

2008-01-04 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20071130

2007-11-24 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070303

2007-11-20 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2007-03-04 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070304

2006-08-09 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20060601

2006-05-05 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2006-03-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20060331

- Year of fee payment: 7

2006-03-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20060331

- Year of fee payment: 7

2006-03-24 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20060324

- Year of fee payment: 7

2006-03-22 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20060322

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-12-13 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2005-10-06 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50011043 P 20051006

2005-08-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR IT SE

2004-04-21 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR IT SE

2003-12-10 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20031024

2003-11-26 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030926

2003-07-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-07-30 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2001-02-07 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: HEESS, KARL

2001-02-07 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: SCHWEIKERT, KARLHEINZ

2001-02-07 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: DISCH, GUENTER

2000-09-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-09-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI