Global Patent Index - EP 1033414 A3

EP 1033414 A3 2002-09-18 - Corrosion resistant polycrystalline abrasive compacts

Title (en)

Corrosion resistant polycrystalline abrasive compacts

Title (de)

Korrosionsbeständige polykristalline Schleifpresskörper

Title (fr)

Korrosionsbeständige polykristalline Schleifpresskörpern

Publication

EP 1033414 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 00301474 A

Priority

US 25895499 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1033414A2] A supported abrasive particle compact is composed of a cobalt-cemented carbide support integrally bonded to an abrasive particle layer of self-bonded diamond particles or CBN particles. The cobalt content in said supported compact is provided in form of a nickel-cobalt alloy wherein the amount of nickel is such that the cobalt is present in the face center cubic (FCC) or e phase. The inventive cutters can be made by infiltration of Ni metal into cemented WC substrate and/or the polycrystalline layer bonded thereto. Bonding includes high pressure/high temperature (HP/HT) formation of the supported polycrystalline compact and the brazing of the polycrystalline compact to the support. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C22C 29/06; B22F 7/06; C22C 29/08; C22C 29/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B24D 3/00 (2006.01); B22F 7/06 (2006.01); B24D 3/34 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B22F 7/06 (2013.01); B24D 3/34 (2013.01); B24D 3/342 (2013.01); B22F 2005/001 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1033414 A2 20000906; EP 1033414 A3 20020918; JP 2000246645 A 20000912; KR 20000062660 A 20001025; ZA 200000781 B 20000913

INPADOC legal status


2004-03-31 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030924

2003-06-25 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030513

2003-06-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB IE IT

2003-05-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030318

2002-09-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-09-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2002-09-11 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7C 22C 29/06 A, 7C 22C 29/08 B, 7C 22C 29/10 B, 7B 22F 7/06 B

2000-09-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-09-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI