Global Patent Index - EP 1033420 A1

EP 1033420 A1 2000-09-06 - Process and apparatus for electrochemically graining a support for light-sensitive layers

Title (en)

Process and apparatus for electrochemically graining a support for light-sensitive layers

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum elektrochemischen Aufrauhen eines Trägers für lichtempfindliche Schichten

Title (fr)

Procédé et dispositif de grainage électrochimique de supports de couches sensibles à la lumière

Publication

EP 1033420 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00104028 A

Priority

DE 19908884 A

Abstract (en)

Process for the electrochemical roughening of a support (2) for light-sensitive layers comprises continuously feeding the support through the electrolytic bath (1). In the roughening zone at the inlet site of the support, the current density in the bath between a first alternating or rotary current electrode and the support is lower than a maximum current density for the roughening. The current density increases to a maximum with increasing removal from the inlet site within the region of the first alternating or rotary current electrode. An Independent claim is also included for an apparatus for the electrochemical roughening of a support (2) comprising an alternating or rotary current electrode arranged in the electrolytic bath and rounded so that its distance (d1) to a support transported through the electrolytic bath is larger on an inlet side (B) in a roughening zone of the bath than within the roughening zone. The distance of the alternating or rotary current electrode to the support is constant from a prescribed removal of the inlet side (B).

Abstract (de)

Zur Vermeidung bzw. zum Minimieren des Auftretens von Querschlägen bzw. Stromschlägen auf einem Träger 2, der durch ein Elektrolytbad 1 transportiert und in diesem elektrochemisch aufgerauht wird, erfolgt eine Regelung der Stromdichte im Elektrolyten zwischen einer ersten Wechsel- oder Drehstromelektrode 10 und dem Träger 2 in der Weise, daß am Beginn der Aufrauhzone die Stromdichte einen niedrigeren Wert als innerhalb der Aufrauhzone, d.h. in Transportrichtung A des Trägers 2 hat. Nach der ersten Wechsel- oder Drehstromelektrode wirkt entweder eine weitere Wechselstromelektrode oder weitere Drehstromelektroden auf den Träger 2 ein. Die erste Wechsel- oder Drehstromelektrode 10 weist einen abgerundeten Umriß auf, der sich aus einem gekrümmten Abschnitt C und einen daran anschließenden geradlinigen Abschnitt D zusammensetzt. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C25F 3/04; C25F 7/00; B41N 3/03

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G03F 7/09 (2006.01); B41N 3/03 (2006.01); C25F 3/04 (2006.01); C25F 3/16 (2006.01); C25F 3/20 (2006.01); C25F 7/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C25F 7/00 (2013.01); B41N 3/034 (2013.01); C25F 3/04 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 1033420 A1 20000906; EP 1033420 B1 20040128; DE 19908884 C1 20001005; JP 2000303200 A 20001031; US 6423206 B1 20020723

INPADOC legal status


2018-02-28 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20171214

- Year of fee payment: 19

2018-02-28 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20171214

- Year of fee payment: 19

2018-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20171214

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-12-14 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-01-18 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-01-06 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2008-12-12 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2007-04-04 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

2005-01-19 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20041029

2004-09-24 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-03-31 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20040310

2004-01-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE FR GB

2004-01-28 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-02-21 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2002-01-16 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: AGFA-GEVAERT

2001-05-23 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: BE FR GB

2000-12-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001017

2000-09-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE FR GB

2000-09-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI