Global patent index - EP 1033426 A1

EP 1033426 A1 2000-09-06 - Method for weaving a pile fabric on a rapier Axminster weaving machine, and a fabric woven according to this method

Title (en)

Method for weaving a pile fabric on a rapier Axminster weaving machine, and a fabric woven according to this method

Title (de)

Verfahren zum Weben von Polgewebe auf einer Greifer-Axminster Webmaschine und nach diesem Verfahren hergestelltes Gewebe

Title (fr)

Procédé pour tisser un tissu à poils sur un métier à tisser du type Axminster à griffes et tissu tissé selon ce procédé

Publication

EP 1033426 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 00200722 A

Priority

BE 9900146 A

Abstract (en)

This invention provides a method for weaving a pile fabric on a rapier Axminster weaving machine, whereby in the course of successive weft insertion cycles alternately one weft thread (1) alone and two weft threads (2), (3) one above the other are inserted between warp threads (4), (5), (6) so that a backing fabric (9) is woven, while pile threads (7) are so introduced that they are interlaced in the backing fabric (9) according to a three-shot weave by weft threads (1) inserted alone, which extend along the pile side of tension warp threads (6). According to this invention an Axminster pile fabric can be woven with pile formation according to a three-shot weave, while one pile row is formed per two weft insertion cycles. Also according to this invention an Axminster pile fabric is provided, in which in successive weft lines alternately one weft thread (1) alone and two weft threads (2), (3) one above the other are inwoven, and in which pile threads (7) are interlaced by weft threads (1) alone according to a three-shot weave. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D03D 27/16; D03D 39/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D03D 27/16 (2006.01); D03D 39/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D03D 27/16 (2013.01); D03D 39/08 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE GB NL PT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1033426 A1 20000906; EP 1033426 B1 20031210; BE 1012497 A5 20001107; DE 60007009 D1 20040122; DE 60007009 T2 20040603; US 6273149 B1 20010814

INPADOC legal status

2014-01-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131001

2014-01-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130301

2014-01-09 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 60007009

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20131001

2013-11-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20130301

2012-06-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20120322

- Year of fee payment: 13

2012-05-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20120323

- Year of fee payment: 13

2008-01-02 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040510

2004-12-01 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20040913

2004-06-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLV1

2004-01-22 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 60007009

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2004-01-22

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2003-12-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE GB NL PT

2003-12-10 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2003-12-10 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031210

2003-12-10 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: DEWISPELAERE, ANDRE

2003-12-10 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: DEBAES, JOHNNY

2001-05-23 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE GB NL PT

2001-04-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010219

2000-09-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE GB NL PT

2000-09-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI