Global Patent Index - EP 1033429 A3

EP 1033429 A3 2000-11-08 - Adjustable fabric stretcher

Title (en)

Adjustable fabric stretcher

Title (de)

Verstellbarer Warenbreithalter

Title (fr)

Elargisseur d'étoffe ajustable

Publication

EP 1033429 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 00104110 A

Priority

DE 19909207 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1033429A2] Adjustable fabric spreader has rigid end pieces (2,3) at a fixed angular position in relation to each other but with a linear adjustment through a setting system. The end pieces (2,3) have a triangular shape, with their points downwards, and a quadrilateral is fitted to their upper corners, which can be adjusted for length but not for width, and is a square when in the center setting. The adjustable fabric spreader, especially for tubular knit goods from a circular knitter, has rigid end pieces (2,3) at a fixed angular position in relation to each other but with a linear adjustment through a setting system. During adjustment, the end pieces retain their shape and alignment. The shifts from the ideal square shape are relatively small. The gaps between the ends (11,12;14,15) of the end piece members (4-7) are the same for both end pieces (2,3), at the corners of the quadrilateral. The setting mechanism moves the end pieces (2,3) towards and away from each other, and holds the end pieces (2,3) in their alignment without a swing shift. The sliding members (4-7) have a fixed length, linked together without a swing movement.. The lower ends of the sliding members (4-7) are linked together by a U- or V-shaped connector (8,9). Each sliding member (4-7) has a carrier (21,22) at the center zone, to link each end piece (2,3) with the setting mechanism. The setting mechanism has a remote control or remote operation. The setting system has a drive (41) and a gearing which moves each end piece (2,3) in opposite directions for their relative linear positioning. The gearing has a spindle, cogwheel, cam or cable system. The setting mechanism can have a fluid drive or a handwheel (41) drive, or an electrical drive. The setting action brings a sprung and pliable positioning to the end pieces (2,3).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D04B 15/88

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D04B 15/88 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D04B 15/88 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1033429 A2 20000906; EP 1033429 A3 20001108; EP 1033429 B1 20031008; DE 19909207 A1 20000907; DE 19909207 C2 20010125; ES 2203359 T3 20040416

INPADOC legal status


2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080229

2009-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080229

2009-01-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080902

2008-12-12 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20081031

2008-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20070216

- Year of fee payment: 8

2008-01-02 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20070531

- Year of fee payment: 8

2007-05-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20060301

2007-04-23 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20070423

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-10-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20060228

2006-03-01 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060301

2006-02-28 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060228

2005-02-24 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20050224

- Year of fee payment: 6

2005-02-17 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20050217

- Year of fee payment: 6

2004-09-29 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040709

2004-07-02 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-04-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2203359 T3

2004-02-04 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20040114

2003-11-13 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50003957 P 20031113

2003-10-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2003-10-08 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-11-13 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20021001

2001-07-25 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES FR GB IT

2001-03-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001230

2000-11-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-08 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-09-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2000-09-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI