Global Patent Index - EP 1033433 A3

EP 1033433 A3 2000-10-25 - Process of protection of dyes on textiles to the attack of bleaching agents such as hydrogen peroxide, perborates and percarbonates

Title (en)

Process of protection of dyes on textiles to the attack of bleaching agents such as hydrogen peroxide, perborates and percarbonates

Title (de)

Verfahren zum Schützen von Farbstoffen auf Textilien vor dem Angriff von Bleichmitteln wie Wasserstoffperoxid, Perborate und Percarbonate

Title (fr)

Procédé de protection des colorants sur les articles textiles contre l'attaque des agents de blanchiment tels que le péroxyde d'hydrogène, les perborates ou les percarbonates

Publication

EP 1033433 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 99121860 A

Priority

PT 10222098 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1033433A2] The invention refers to a process of colour protection of dyed textile goods to the attack by peroxides, either due to industrial bleaching or peroxide application in the washing machine, such as occurs when the textiles are prebleached or washed with detergents that contain peroxides such as perborates and percarbonates. The most sensitive dyes are reactive and sulphur dyes for cotton. Some dyes belonging to these classes lose colour strength and alter their hue. In this invention a new process of colour protection for dyed goods is revealed, by the application of quenchers, which when applied simultaneously with the peroxide, inhibit the peroxide attack on the dyes present in the textile fibres. The products claimed in this invention to work as efficient quenchers and colour protectors are ascorbic acid, DABCO or 1,4-diaza-2,2,2-biciclooctane and diphenylamine.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D06L 3/02; C11D 3/39; C11D 7/54; C11D 3/20; C11D 7/26

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C11D 3/20 (2006.01); C11D 3/39 (2006.01); C11D 7/26 (2006.01); C11D 7/32 (2006.01); D06L 3/02 (2006.01); D06P 5/04 (2006.01); D06P 5/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C11D 3/2096 (2013.01); C11D 3/28 (2013.01); C11D 3/30 (2013.01); C11D 3/39 (2013.01); C11D 3/3947 (2013.01); C11D 7/263 (2013.01); C11D 7/264 (2013.01); C11D 7/3227 (2013.01); D06L 4/10 (2017.01); D06L 4/12 (2017.01); D06P 5/04 (2013.01); D06P 5/06 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1033433 A2 20000906; EP 1033433 A3 20001025; PT 102220 A 20000531; PT 102220 B 20010531

INPADOC legal status


2005-07-06 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20050104

2004-01-14 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: UNIVERSIDADE DO MINHO

2003-05-21 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030403

2002-01-02 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: LIMA, CARLOS JOAQUIM ESTEVES

2002-01-02 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: GOMES, JAIME ISIDORE NAYLOR ROCHA

2001-09-12 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-07-18 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK LI

2001-01-24 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001109

2000-10-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-10-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-09-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-09-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI